No. 19-510
Title:Jose Javier Banegas Gomez, Petitioner
v.
William P. Barr, Attorney General
Docketed:October 21, 2019
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit
   Case Numbers:(15-3269)
   Decision Date:April 23, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:July 23, 2019
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 16 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 20, 2019)
Oct 16 2019Pursuant to Rule 34.6 and Paragraph 9 of the Guidelines for the Submission of Documents to the Supreme Court's Electronic Filing System, filings in this case should be submitted in paper form only, and should not be submitted through the Court's electronic filing system.
Nov 14 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from November 20, 2019 to December 20, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Nov 15 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including December 20, 2019.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Glenn L. Formica
    Counsel of Record
Formica Doyle, PC
195 Church Street
New Haven, CT 06510

(203) 787-1946
Party name: Jose Javier Banegas Gomez
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Barr, Att'y Gen.