No. 19-508
Vide 19-825
Title:AMG Capital Management, LLC, et al., Petitioners
v.
Federal Trade Commission
Docketed:October 21, 2019
Linked with 19A252
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(16-17197)
   Decision Date:December 3, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:June 20, 2019
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Sep 03 2019Application (19A252) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from September 18, 2019 to October 18, 2019, submitted to Justice Kagan.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsOtherProof of Service
Sep 03 2019Application (19A252) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until October 18, 2019.
Oct 18 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 20, 2019)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 13 2019Brief amicus curiae of Cause of Action Institute filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 18 2019Brief amicus curiae of Washington Legal Foundation filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 20 2019Brief amici curiae of Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America and National Retail Federation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 20 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from November 20, 2019 to December 20, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Nov 21 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including December 20, 2019.
Dec 13 2019Brief of respondent Federal Trade Commission filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word Count
Dec 18 2019Letter waiving the 14-day waiting period for the distribution of the petition under Rule 15.5 filed.
Main Document
Dec 20 2019Reply of petitioners AMG Capital Management, LLC, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 23 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/10/2020.
Jan 02 2020Rescheduled.
Apr 01 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/17/2020.
Apr 02 2020Rescheduled.
Apr 28 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/15/2020.
Jun 22 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/25/2020.
Jun 23 2020Supplemental brief of petitioners AMG Capital Management, LLC, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 29 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 7/1/2020.
Jul 08 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 7/8/2020.
Jul 09 2020Petition GRANTED. The petition for a writ of certiorari in No. 19-825 is granted. The cases are consolidated, and a total of one hour is allotted for oral argument. VIDED.
Jul 09 2020Because the Court has consolidated these cases for briefing and oral argument, future filings and activity in the cases will now be reflected on the docket of No. 19-508. Subsequent filings in these cases must therefore be submitted through the electronic filing system in No. 19-508. Each document submitted in connection with one or more of these cases must include on its cover the case number and caption for each case in which the filing is intended to be submitted. Where a filing is submitted in fewer than all of the cases, the docket entry will reflect the case number(s) in which the filing is submitted; a document filed in all of the consolidated cases will be noted as “VIDED.”
Aug 10 2020Joint motion for alignment and extension of time to file the briefs on the merits filed.
Main Document
Aug 11 2020Blanket Consent filed by Credit Bureau Center, LLC, et al. VIDED.
Blanket Consent
Aug 12 2020Joint motion for alignment and an extension of time to file the briefs on the merits granted. Petitioners in No. 19-508 and respondents in No. 19-825 have to and including September 25, 2020, within which to file the joint appendix and their opening briefs on the merits. The Federal Trade Commission has to and including November 30, 2020, within which to file its consolidated response brief on the merits. VIDED.
Aug 20 2020Blanket Consent filed by Respondent, Federal Trade Commission
Blanket Consent
Sep 17 2020Joint motion to dispense with printing the joint appendix filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Sep 25 2020Brief of respondents Credit Bureau Center, LLC, et al. filed (in 19-825).
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 25 2020Blanket Consent filed by Petitioners, AMG Capital Management, LLC, et al. VIDED
Blanket Consent
Sep 25 2020Brief of petitioners AMG Capital Management, LLC, et al. filed (in 19-508).
Certificate of Word CountProof of ServiceMain Document
Oct 01 2020Brief amicus curiae of Americans for Prosperity Foundation filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 02 2020Brief amici curiae of Washington Legal Foundation, et al. filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 02 2020Brief amicus curiae of TechFreedom filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 02 2020Brief amicus curiae of Surescripts, LLC filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 02 2020Brief amici curiae of Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, et al. filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 02 2020Brief amicus curiae of The Pharmaceutical Research and Manufacturers of America filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 02 2020Brief amicus curiae of The New Civil Liberties Alliance filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 02 2020Amicus brief of SBH A&I submitted.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 05 2020Joint motion to dispense with printing the joint appendix filed by the parties GRANTED. VIDED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Neal Kumar Katyal
    Counsel of Record
Hogan Lovells US LLP
555 Thirteenth St., N.W.
Washington, DC 20004

neal.katyal@hoganlovells.com
202 637 5528
Party name: Credit Bureau Center, LLC, et al.
Jeffrey Alan Lamken
    Counsel of Record
MoloLamken LLP
The Watergate, Suite 660
600 New Hampshire Ave., N.W.
Washington, DC 20037

jlamken@mololamken.com
2025562010
Party name: AMG Capital Management, LLC, et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Alden Francis Abbott
    Counsel of Record
U.S. Federal Trade Commission
600 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20580

aabbott@ftc.gov
202-326-2505
Party name: Federal Trade Commission
Jeffrey B. WallActing Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Federal Trade Commission
Other
Ilana Hope Eisenstein
    Counsel of Record
DLA Piper LLP (US)
1650 Market Street
Suite 5000
Philadelphia, PA 19109-7300

ilana.eisenstein@dlapiper.com
215-656-3300
Party name: Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America and National Retail Federation
Asheesh Agarwal
    Counsel of Record
TechFreedom
110 Maryland Ave NE, Suite #205
Washington, DC 20002

aagarwal@techfreedom.org
7033383913
Party name: TechFreedom
Cory L. Andrews
    Counsel of Record
Washington Legal Foundation
2009 Massachusetts Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC 20036

candrews@wlf.org
2025880302
Party name: Washington Legal Foundation
Cynthia Fleming Crawford
    Counsel of Record
Americans for Prosperity Foundation
1310 N. Courthouse Road
7th Floor
Arlington, VA 22201

ccrawford@afphq.org
5713292227
Party name: Americans for Prosperity Foundation
Cynthia Fleming Crawford
    Counsel of Record
Cause of Action Institute
1310 N. Courthouse Road
7th Floor
Arlington, VA 22201

cynthia.crawford@causeofaction.org
2024992421
Party name: Cause of Action Institute
John David Graubert
    Counsel of Record
Covington & Burling LLP
One CityCenter
850 Tenth St. NW
Washington, DC 20001-4956

jgraubert@cov.com
2026625938
Party name: The Pharmaceutical Research and Manufacturers of America
Roman Martinez V
    Counsel of Record
Latham & Watkins, LLP
555 Eleventh Street, NW
Washington, DC 20004

roman.martinez@lw.com
202-637-3377
Party name: Surescripts, LLC
John Julian Vecchione
    Counsel of Record
The New Civil Liberties Alliance
1225 19th St. NW
Suite 450
Washington, DC 20036-2411

john.vecchione@ncla.onmicrosoft.com
2029186902
Party name: The New Civil Liberties Alliance
Daryl M. Williams
    Counsel of Record
Williams|Mestaz, LLP
6225 N. 24th St.
Suite 125
Phoenix, AZ 85028

dwilliams@williamsmestaz.com
6024457735
Party name: SBH A&I