No. 19-507
Title:Publishers Business Services, Inc., et al., Petitioners
v.
Federal Trade Commission
Docketed:October 18, 2019
Linked with 19A255
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-15600)
   Decision Date:August 31, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:June 19, 2019
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Aug 30 2019Application (19A255) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from September 17, 2019 to October 18, 2019, submitted to Justice Kagan.
Main Document
Sep 05 2019Application (19A255) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until October 18, 2019.
Oct 18 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 18, 2019)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 13 2019Brief amicus curiae of Cause of Action Institute filed. VIDED
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 18 2019Brief amicus curiae of Washington Legal Foundation filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 18 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from November 18, 2019 to December 18, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Nov 19 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including December 18, 2019.
Dec 13 2019Brief of respondent Federal Trade Commission in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word Count
Dec 20 2019Letter waiving the 14-day waiting period for the distribution of the petition under Rule 15.5 filed.
Main Document
Dec 23 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/10/2020.
Dec 23 2019Reply of petitioners Publishers Business Services, Inc., et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 02 2020Rescheduled.
Apr 01 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/17/2020.
Apr 02 2020Rescheduled.
Apr 28 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/15/2020.
Jun 22 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/25/2020.
Jun 29 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 7/1/2020.
Jun 30 2020Supplemental brief of petitioners Publishers Business Services, Inc., et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Peter Winslow Homer
    Counsel of Record
Homer Bonner Jacobs, P.A.
1200 Four Season Tower
1441 Brickell Avenue
Miami, FL 33131

phomer@homerbonner.com
305-350-5139
Party name: Publishers Business Services, Inc., et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: FTC
Other
Corbin Knight Barthold
    Counsel of Record
Washington Legal Foundation
2009 Massachusetts Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20036

cbarthold@wlf.org
2025880302
Party name: Washington Legal Foundation
Cynthia Fleming Crawford
    Counsel of Record
Cause of Action Institute
1310 N. Courthouse Road
7th Floor
Arlington, VA 22201

cynthia.crawford@causeofaction.org
2024992421
Party name: Cause of Action Institute