No. 19-496 | |
Title: | DISH Network L.L.C., Petitioner v. Thomas H. Krakauer, Individually and on Behalf of All Others Similarly Situated |
Docketed: | October 17, 2019 |
Linked with 19A188 | |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit |
Case Numbers: | (18-1518) |
Decision Date: | May 30, 2019 |
Date | Proceedings and Orders |
Aug 16 2019 | Application (19A188) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from August 28, 2019 to October 15, 2019, submitted to The Chief Justice. |
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service | |
Aug 19 2019 | Application (19A188) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until October 15, 2019. |
Oct 15 2019 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 18, 2019) |
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Nov 12 2019 | Brief of respondent Thomas H. Krakauer in opposition filed. |
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | |
Nov 18 2019 | Brief amicus curiae of Cruise Lines International Association filed. |
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountCertificate of Word Count | |
Nov 19 2019 | Supplemental brief of respondent Thomas H. Krakauer filed. |
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Nov 25 2019 | Reply of petitioner DISH Network L.L.C. filed. |
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Nov 26 2019 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/13/2019. |
Dec 16 2019 | Petition DENIED. |
NAME | ADDRESS | PHONE |
Attorneys for Petitioner | ||
E. Joshua Rosenkranz Counsel of Record | Orrick, Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP 51 West 52nd Street New York, NY 10019 jrosenkranz@orrick.com | 212-506-5380 |
Party name: DISH Network L.L.C. | ||
Attorneys for Respondent | ||
Deepak Gupta Counsel of Record | Gupta Wessler PLLC 1900 L Street, NW Suite 312 Washington, DC 20036 deepak@guptawessler.com | (202) 888-1741 |
Party name: Thomas H. Krakauer | ||
Other | ||
Bradley Michael Rose Counsel of Record | Kaye, Rose & Maltzman 169 South Rodeo Drive Beverly Hills, CA 90212 Los Angeles, CA 90212 brose@kayerose.com | (310) 551-6555 |
Party name: Cruise Lines International Association |