No. 19-494
Title:David Zachary Morgan, Petitioner
v.
Washington
Docketed:October 17, 2019
Linked with 19A119
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Washington
   Case Numbers:(96017-8)
   Decision Date:May 16, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jul 26 2019Application (19A119) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from August 14, 2019 to October 13, 2019, submitted to Justice Kagan.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Jul 29 2019Application (19A119) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until October 13, 2019.
Oct 15 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 18, 2019)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 18 2019Brief amici curiae of Brooks Holland and Benjamin Levin filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 18 2019Motion for leave to file amici brief filed by Washington Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers and Colorado Criminal Defense Bar.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Dec 04 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/10/2020.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Amir H. Ali
    Counsel of Record
Roderick & Solange MacArthur Justice Center
777 6th St. NW
11th Floor
Washington, DC 20001

amir.ali@macarthurjustice.org
202-869-3434
Party name: David Zachery Morgan
Other
Robert K. Kry
    Counsel of Record
MoloLamken LLP
600 New Hampshire Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20037

rkry@mololamken.com
2025562011
Party name: Brooks Holland and Benjamin Levin
Eric B. Wolff
    Counsel of Record
Perkins Coie LLP
1201 Third Ave., Suite 4900
Seattle, WA 98101

ewolff@perkinscoie.com
206-359-8000
Party name: Washington Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers and Colorado Criminal Defense Bar