No. 19-475
Title:Serah Njoki Karingithi, Petitioner
v.
William P. Barr, Attorney General
Docketed:October 10, 2019
Linked with 19A104
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(16-70885)
   Decision Date:January 28, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:May 8, 2019
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jul 23 2019Application (19A104) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from August 6, 2019 to October 5, 2019, submitted to Justice Kagan.
Jul 23 2019Pursuant to Rule 34.6 and Paragraph 9 of the Guidelines for the Submission of Documents to the Supreme Court's Electronic Filing System, filings in this case should be submitted in paper form only, and should not be submitted through the Court's electronic filing system.
Jul 25 2019Application (19A104) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until October 7, 2019.
Oct 07 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 12, 2019)
Oct 30 2019Brief amicus curiae of Lonny Hoffman filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Nov 12 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from November 12, 2019 to December 12, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Nov 14 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including December 12, 2019.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Jerome Philippe Mayer-Cantu4287 Gilbert St.
Oakland, CA 94511

jmayercantu@gmail.com
(415) 530-6444
Party name: Serah Karingithi
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Barr, William
Other
Lonny Sheinkopf Hoffman
    Counsel of Record
University of Houston L. Cen.
4604 Calhoun Road
Houston, TX 77204-6060

lhoffman@uh.edu
7138759627
Party name: Lonny Hoffman