No. 19-47
Title:Jeryme Morgan, Petitioner
v.
Minh Schott, et al.
Docketed:July 8, 2019
Linked with 18A1113
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Seventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(16-2384)
   Decision Date:February 5, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Apr 26 2019Application (18A1113) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from May 6, 2019 to July 5, 2019, submitted to Justice Kavanaugh.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Apr 29 2019Application (18A1113) granted by Justice Kavanaugh extending the time to file until July 5, 2019.
Jul 05 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due August 7, 2019)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 16 2019Waiver of right of respondents Minh Schott, et al. to respond filed.
Main Document
Jul 24 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/1/2019.
Aug 07 2019Brief amicus curiae of The National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 14 2019Response Requested. (Due September 13, 2019)
Aug 30 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from September 13, 2019 to October 29, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Sep 04 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including October 29, 2019.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Michael Anthony Scodro
    Counsel of Record
Mayer Brown LLP
71 South Wacker Drive
Chicago, IL 60606

mscodro@mayerbrown.com
312-701-8886
Party name: Jeryme Morgan
Attorneys for Respondents
Frank Henry Bieszczat
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Illinois Attorney General
100 West Randolph Street, 12th Floor
Chicago, IL 60601

fbieszczat@atg.state.il.us
312-814-2234
Party name: Minh Schott, et al.
Other
Anthony F. Shelley
    Counsel of Record
Miller & Chevalier Chartered
900 Sixteenth Street NW
Washington, DC 20006

ashelley@milchev.com
202-626-5800
Party name: The National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers