No. 19-465
Title:Peter B. Chiafalo, Levi Jennet Guerra, and Esther Virginia John, Petitioners
v.
Washington
Docketed:October 9, 2019
Linked with 19A138, 19A894
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Washington
   Case Numbers:(95347-3)
   Decision Date:May 23, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Aug 02 2019Application (19A138) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from August 21, 2019 to October 20, 2019, submitted to Justice Kagan.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Aug 05 2019Application (19A138) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until October 20, 2019.
Oct 07 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 8, 2019)
PetitionProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Oct 15 2019Blanket Consent filed by Petitioners, Peter Bret Chiafalo, et al.
Blanket Consent
Nov 06 2019Amicus brief of Michael L. Rosin & David G. Post not accepted for filing. (November 06, 2019) (Corrected efiling submitted)
Nov 06 2019Brief amici curiae of Michael L. Rosin & David G. Post filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 08 2019Brief of respondent Washington in opposition filed.
Certificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 08 2019Brief of respondent Washington in opposition filed. (February 10, 2020 - PDF with appendix provided)
Main Document
Nov 08 2019Brief amicus curiae of Vinz Koller filed.
Proof of ServiceMain DocumentCertificate of Word Count
Nov 22 2019Reply of petitioners Peter Bret Chiafalo, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountCertificate of Word Count
Nov 26 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/13/2019.
Dec 05 2019Rescheduled.
Dec 11 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/10/2020.
Jan 13 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/17/2020.
Jan 17 2020Petition GRANTED. The petition for a writ of certiorari in No. 19-518 is granted. The cases are consolidated, and a total of one hour is allotted for oral argument. VIDED.
Jan 17 2020Because the Court has consolidated these cases for briefing and oral argument, future filings and activity in the cases will now be reflected on the docket of No. 19-465. Subsequent filings in these cases must therefore be submitted through the electronic filing system in No. 19-465. Each document submitted in connection with one or more of these cases must include on its cover the case number and caption for each case in which the filing is intended to be submitted. Where a filing is submitted in fewer than all of the cases, the docket entry will reflect the case number(s) in which the filing is submitted; a document filed in all of the consolidated cases will be noted as “VIDED.”
Jan 27 2020Petitioners in No. 19-465 and respondents in No. 19-518 shall file opening and reply briefs on the merits under the schedule set forth in Rules 25.1 and 25.3. Respondent in No. 19-465 and petitioner in No. 19-518 shall file response briefs on the merits under the schedule set forth in Rule 25.2.
Jan 27 2020Blanket Consent filed by Peter Bret Chiafalo, et al., and Micheal Baca, et al. VIDED.
Blanket Consent
Feb 11 2020Blanket Consent filed by Colorado Department of State. VIDED.
Blanket Consent
Feb 11 2020Application (19A894) of Presidential Electors to file a consolidated opening brief on the merits in excess of the word limit, submitted to Justice Sotomayor. VIDED.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Feb 11 2020Blanket Consent filed by Washington. VIDED.
Blanket Consent
Feb 11 2020Application for leave to exceed word limits of Peter Bret Chiafalo, et al. submitted.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Feb 14 2020Application (19A894) of Presidential Electors to file a consolidated opening brief on the merits in excess of the word limit is granted by Justice Sotomayor provided that the brief does not exceed 16,000 words.
Feb 18 2020Motion of Colorado Department of State for an extension of time to file the joint appendix filed (in 19-518).
Main Document
Feb 20 2020Motion of Colorado Department of State to extend the time to file the joint appendix as to No. 19-518 is granted and the time is extended to and including April 1, 2020.
Feb 20 2020Motion to dispense with printing the joint appendix filed (in 19-465).
Main DocumentProof of Service
Feb 21 2020SET FOR ARGUMENT on Tuesday, April 28, 2020 (amended March 10, 2020).
Feb 26 2020Record requested from the Supreme Court of Washington.
Mar 02 2020Motion to dispense with printing the joint appendix in No. 19-465 GRANTED.
Mar 02 2020Brief of Presidential Electors filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 03 2020The record received from the Supreme Court of Washington has been electronically filed.
Mar 05 2020Brief amicus curiae of Citizens for Self-Governance filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountCertificate of Word Count
Mar 06 2020Brief amicus curiae of Professor Derek T. Muller in support of neither party filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 06 2020Brief amici curiae of Michael L. Rosin, et al. filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 06 2020Brief amicus curiae of Independence Institute filed. VIDED
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 09 2020Brief amicus curiae of Professor Edward B. Foley in support of neither party filed. VIDED
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 09 2020Brief amicus curiae of Jerry H. Goldfeder filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 09 2020Brief amicus curiae of Making Every Vote Count Foundation in support of neither party filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 09 2020Brief amicus curiae of Vinz Koller filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 09 2020Brief amicus curiae of Professor Michael T. Morley in support of neither party filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 10 2020This case is no longer consolidated with No. 19-518, CO Dept. of State v. Baca, and one hour is allotted for oral argument in this case.
Mar 10 2020Letter from Clerk of Court to counsel of record noting that Justice Sotomayor will not continue to participate in No. 19-518.
Main Document
Mar 19 2020CIRCULATED
Apr 01 2020Brief of respondent Washington filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 03 2020ORAL ARGUMENT POSTPONED.
Apr 07 2020Brief amicus curiae of Public Citizen, Inc. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 08 2020Brief amici curiae of South Dakota and 44 States and the District of Columbia filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Apr 08 2020Brief amici curiae of Campaign Legal Center and Issue One filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 08 2020Brief amicus curiae and appendix of Professor Robert W. Bennett filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentOtherProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Apr 08 2020Brief amicus curiae of The Republican National Committee filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 13 2020Argument to be rescheduled for May 2020.
Apr 15 2020RESCHEDULED FOR ARGUMENT on Wednesday, May 13, 2020.
May 01 2020Reply of petitioners Peter Bret Chiafalo, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 12 2020Letter from counsel for petitioner filed. (Distributed)
Main Document
May 13 2020Argued. For petitioners: L. Lawrence Lessig, Cambridge, Mass. For respondent: Noah Purcell, Solicitor General, Olympia, Wash.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
L. Lawrence Lessig
    Counsel of Record
Equal Citizens
12 Eliot St.
Cambridge, MA 02138

lessig@law.harvard.edu
617-496-1124
Party name: Peter Bret Chiafalo, et al.
Eric Reuel Olson
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
1300 Broadway
10th Floor
Denver, CO 80203

eric.olson@coag.gov
720-508-6548
Party name: Colorado Department of State
Attorneys for Respondent
Noah Guzzo Purcell
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General
1125 Washington Street, SE
P.O. Box 40100
Olympia, WA 98504-0100

noahp@atg.wa.gov
360-753-2536
Party name: Washington
Other
Jessica Ring Amunson
    Counsel of Record
Jenner & Block LLP
1099 New York Avenue NW
Suite 900
Washington, DC 20001

JAmunson@jenner.com
202-639-6023
Party name: Professor Edward B. Foley
Andrew John Dhuey
    Counsel of Record
456 Boynton Avenue
Berkeley, CA 94707

ajdhuey@comcast.net
(510) 528-8200
Party name: Vinz Koller
Michael Nicholas Donofrio
    Counsel of Record
Stris & Maher LLP
777 S. Figueroa St., Ste. 3850
Los Angeles, CA 90017

michael.donofrio@strismaher.com
(213) 995-6800
Party name: Michael L. Rosin & David G. Post
Rita Martin Dunaway
    Counsel of Record
Citizens for Self-Governance
2379 Massanetta Springs Road
Harrisonburg, VA 22801

rdunaway@cosaction.com
5408301229
Party name: Citizens for Self-Governance
Jerrold Joseph Ganzfried
    Counsel of Record
Ganzfried Law
5335 Wisconsin Avenue, NW Suite 440
Washington, DC 20015

JJG@ganzfriedlaw.com
202-486-2004
Party name: Making Every Vote Count Foundation
Jerry H. Goldfeder
    Counsel of Record
Stroock & Stroock & Lavan LLP
180 Maiden Lane
New York, NY 10038

jgoldfeder@stroock.com
212-806-5857
Party name: Jerry H. Goldfeder
David Benjamin Kopel
    Counsel of Record
Independence Institute
Independence Institute
727 East 16th Avenue
Denver, CO 80203

david@i2i.org
3032796536
Party name: Independence Institute
Tobias Samuel Loss-Eaton
    Counsel of Record
Sidley Austin LLP
1501 K Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20005

tlosseaton@sidley.com
(202) 736-8427
Party name: Campaign Legal Center and Issue One
Michael T. Morley
    Counsel of Record
Florida State University College of Law
425 W. Jefferson Street
Roberts Hall, Office 313
Tallahassee, FL 32301

michaelmorleyesq@hotmail.com
8607783883
Party name: Professor Michael T. Morley
Scott Lawrence Nelson
    Counsel of Record
Public Citizen Litigation Group
1600 20th Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20009

snelson@citizen.org
202-588-1000
Party name: Public Citizen, Inc.
Ian Seth Speir
    Counsel of Record
Nussbaum Speir Gleason PLLC
2 N. Cascade Ave.
Suite 1430
Colorado Springs, CO 80903

ian@nussbaumspeir.com
7194284937
Party name: Professor Derek T. Muller
Paul S. Swedlund
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General
1302 E. Highway 14, Suite 1
Pierre, SD 57501-8501

paul.swedlund@state.sd.us
6057735402
Party name: South Dakota and 44 States and the District of Columbia
Jack Samuel Tenenbaum
    Counsel of Record
Bluhm Legal Clinic
Northwestern Pritzer School of Law
375 East Chicago Ave.
Chicago, IL 60611

s-tenenbaum@law.northwestern.edu
3125034808
Party name: Professor Robert W. Bennett
Michael Eugene Toner
    Counsel of Record
Wiley, Rein & Fielding
1776 K Street, NW
Washington, DC 20006

mtoner@wiley.law
2027197545
Party name: The Republican National Committee