No. 19-46
Title:United States Patent and Trademark Office, et al., Petitioners
v.
Booking.com B.V.
Docketed:July 8, 2019
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-2458, 17-2459)
   Decision Date:February 4, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:April 5, 2019
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jul 05 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due August 7, 2019)
PetitionProof of Service
Aug 07 2019Brief of respondent Booking.com B.V. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 21 2019Reply of petitioners United States Patent and Trademark Office, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word Count
Oct 09 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/1/2019.
Nov 04 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/8/2019.
Nov 08 2019Petition GRANTED.
Dec 09 2019Motion for an extension of time to file the briefs on the merits filed.
Main Document
Dec 10 2019Motion to extend the time to file the briefs on the merits granted. The time to file the joint appendix and petitioners' brief on the merits is extended to and including January 6, 2020. The time to file respondent's brief on the merits is extended to and including February 12, 2020.
Jan 06 2020Joint appendix filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jan 06 2020Brief of petitioners United States Patent and Trademark Office, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jan 13 2020Brief amici curiae of Trademark Scholars in support of neither party filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jan 13 2020Brief amicus curiae of American Intellectual Property Law Association in support of neither party filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 13 2020Brief amicus curiae of Electronic Frontier Foundation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 31 2020SET FOR ARGUMENT on Monday, March 23, 2020.
Feb 12 2020Brief of respondent Booking.com B.V. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 19 2020Record requested from the U.S.C.A. 4th Circuit.
Feb 19 2020CIRCULATED
Feb 19 2020Brief amici curiae of Trademark and Internet Law Professors filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 19 2020Brief amici curiae of Salesforce.com, Inc., et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 19 2020Brief amici curiae of Survey Scholars and Consultants filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 19 2020Brief amicus curiae of The International Trademark Association filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 19 2020Brief amicus curiae of The Association of Amicus Counsel filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 19 2020Brief amicus curiae of Intellectual Property Owners Association filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 19 2020Brief amici curiae of Professor Peter N. Golder, Ph.D., and other Marketing Academics filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 19 2020Brief amicus curiae of Internet Commerce Association filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 19 2020Brief amicus curiae of Boston Patent Law Association filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 19 2020Brief amicus curiae of The Intellectual Property Law Association of Chicago filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Feb 19 2020Brief amicus curiae of New York Intellectual Property Law Association filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 19 2020Brief amicus curiae of Coalition of .Com Brand Owners filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Feb 20 2020The record is located on PACER. Sealed record material from the USCA 4th Circuit electronically received.
Mar 13 2020Reply of petitioners United States Patent and Trademark Office, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word Count
Mar 16 2020ORAL ARGUMENT POSTPONED.
Apr 13 2020Argument to be rescheduled for May 2020.
Apr 15 2020RESCHEDULED FOR ARGUMENT on Monday, May 4, 2020.
May 04 2020Argued. For petitioners: Erica L. Ross, Assistant to the Solicitor General, Department of Justice, Washington, D. C. For respondent: Lisa S. Blatt, Washington, D. C.
Jun 30 2020Adjudged to be AFFIRMED. Ginsburg, J., delivered the opinion of the Court, in which Roberts, C. J., and Thomas, Alito, Sotomayor, Kagan, Gorsuch, and Kavanaugh, JJ., joined. Sotomayor, J., filed a concurring opinion. Breyer, J., filed a dissenting opinion.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States Patent and Trademark Office, et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Lisa Schiavo Blatt
    Counsel of Record
Williams & Connolly LLP
725 12th Street, NW
Washington, DC 20005

lblatt@wc.com
202-434-5050
Party name: Booking.com B.V.
Jonathan E. MoskinFoley & Lardner LLP
90 Park Avenue
New York, NY 10016-1314

jmoskin@foley.com
212-682-7474
Party name: Booking.com B.V.
Other
Erik Paul Belt
    Counsel of Record
McCarter & English, LLP
265 Franklin Street, 14th Floor
Boston, MA 02110

ebelt@mccarter.com
617-449-6500
Party name: Boston Patent Law Association
Megan L. Brown
    Counsel of Record
Wiley Rein LLP
1776 K Street NW
Washington, DC 20006

MBrown@wiley.law
(202) 719-7000
Party name: Internet Commerce Association
Michael Carl Cannata
    Counsel of Record
Rivkin Radler, LLP
926 RXR Plaza
Uniondale, NY 11556

michael.cannata@rivkin.com
516-357-3000
Party name: New York Intellectual Property Law Association
Thad Chaloemtiarana
    Counsel of Record
Pattishall, McAuliffe, Newbury, Hillard and Geraldson, LLP
200 S. Wacker Drive, Suite 2900
Chicago, IL 60606-5896

tc@pattishall.com
3125548000
Party name: Coalition of .Com Brand Owners
Margaret M. Duncan
    Counsel of Record
Loyola University Chicago School of Law
25 E Pearson Street
Chicago, IL 60611

mduncan@luc.edu
312 915 7120
Party name: The Intellectual Property Law Association of Chicago
Mark David Harris
    Counsel of Record
Proskauer Rose LLP
Eleven Times Square
New York, NY 10036

mharris@proskauer.com
212-969-3530
Party name: Survey Scholars and Consultants
Richard Charles Henn Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Kilpatrick Stockton, LLP
1100 Peachtree Street
Suite 2800
Atlanta, GA 30309

chenn@kilpatricktownsend.com
404-815-6572
Party name: Professor Peter N. Golder, Ph.D., and other Marketing Academics
Thomas G. Hungar
    Counsel of Record
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
1050 Connecticut Ave. NW
Washington, DC 20036

thungar@gibsondunn.com
2029558500
Party name: Salesforce.com, Inc. and The Home Depot, Inc.
John Michael Jakes
    Counsel of Record
Finnegan, Henderson, et al.
901 New York Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC 20001-4413

mike.jakes@finnegan.com
202 408 4045
Party name: Trademark and Internet Law Professors
Charles E. Miller
    Counsel of Record
Leichtman Law PLLC
228 East 45th Street
New York, NY 10017

charles.miller@cmilleriplaw.com
2124195210
Party name: The Association of Amicus Counsel
Eric Robert Moran
    Counsel of Record
McDonnell Boehnen Hulbert & Berghoff LLP
300 South Wacker Drive
Chicago, IL 60606

moran@mbhb.com
(312) 913-0001
Party name: Intellectual Property Owners Assoc
Alexandra Helen Moss
    Counsel of Record
Electronic Frontier Foundation
815 Eddy Street
San Francisco, CA 94109

alex@eff.org
4154369333
Party name: Electronic Frontier Foundation
Lawrence K. Nodine
    Counsel of Record
Ballard Spahr, LLP
999 Peachtree St., Suite 1000
Atlanta, GA 30309

nodinel@ballardspahr.com
(678) 420-9422
Party name: The International Trademark Association
Rebecca Leah Tushnet
    Counsel of Record
Harvard Law School
1575 Massachusetts Ave.
Hauser 520
Cambridge, MA 02138

rtushnet@law.harvard.edu
703-593-6759
Party name: Trademark Scholars
Craig Brian Whitney
    Counsel of Record
Frankfurt Kurnit Klein & Selz P.C.
28 Liberty Street
New York, NY 10005

cwhitney@fkks.com
212-826-5583
Party name: American Intellectual Property Law Association