No. 19-454
Vide 19-431
Title:Donald J. Trump, President of the United States, et al., Petitioners
v.
Pennsylvania, et al.
Docketed:October 7, 2019
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Third Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-3752, 18-1253, 19-1129, 19-1189)
   Decision Date:July 12, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 03 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 6, 2019)
PetitionProof of Service
Oct 22 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from November 6, 2019 to December 16, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Oct 24 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted in part; the time is extended to and including December 9, 2019.
Oct 31 2019Brief amicus curiae of Foundation for Moral Law filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 01 2019Brief amici curiae of 92 Members of Congress filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 01 2019Brief amicus curiae of The States Of Texas, et al. filed. VIDED.(11/5/2019)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Nov 01 2019Brief amici curiae of The Cato Institute, et al. filed. VIDED
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 05 2019Amicus brief of The States Of Texas, Alabama, Alaska, Arizona, Arkansas, Georgia, Kansas, Louisiana, Missouri, Montana, Oklahoma, South Carolina, South Dakota, Tennessee, Utah, And West Virginia not accepted for filing. (November 04, 2019)(Corrected version submitted)
Nov 06 2019Brief amicus curiae of American Center for Law and Justice filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 09 2019Brief of respondents Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 20 2019Reply of petitioners Donald J. Trump, President of the United States, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word Count
Dec 23 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/10/2020.
Jan 13 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/17/2020.
Jan 17 2020Petition GRANTED. The petition for a writ of certiorari in No. 19-431 is granted. The cases are consolidated, and a total of one hour is allotted for oral argument. VIDED.
Jan 17 2020Because the Court has consolidated these cases for briefing and oral argument, future filings and activity in the cases will now be reflected on the docket of No. 19-431. Subsequent filings in these cases must therefore be submitted through the electronic filing system in No. 19-431. Each document submitted in connection with one or more of these cases must include on its cover the case number and caption for each case in which the filing is intended to be submitted. Where a filing is submitted in fewer than all of the cases, the docket entry will reflect the case number(s) in which the filing is submitted; a document filed in all of the consolidated cases will be noted as “VIDED.”
Feb 21 2020SET FOR ARGUMENT on Wednesday, April 29, 2020. VIDED.
Feb 26 2020Record requested from the U.S.C.A. 3rd Circuit.
Mar 04 2020Amicus brief of United States Conference of Catholic Bishops, et al. not accepted for filing. (March 19, 2020 -- Filed in lead case)
Mar 19 2020CIRCULATED
Mar 19 2020The record received from the U.S.D.C. Eastern District of Pennsylvania has been electronically filed.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Donald J. Trump, President of the United States, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Michael J. Fischer
    Counsel of Record
Pennsylvania Office of Attorney General
1600 Arch St.
Suite 300
Philadelphia, PA 19103

mfischer@attorneygeneral.gov
215-560-2171
Party name: Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, et al.
Other
Richard Shawn Gunnarson
    Counsel of Record
Kirton McConkie
Key Bank Tower
36 South State Street, Suite 1900
Salt Lake City, UT 84111

sgunnarson@kmclaw.com
801-323-5907
Party name: United States Conference of Catholic Bishops, et al.
Richard A. Samp
    Counsel of Record
New Civil Liberties Alliance
1225 19th Street NW, Suite 450
Washington, DC 20036

rasamp@verizon.net
202-869-5210
Party name: New Civil Liberties Alliance
Matthew James Clark
    Counsel of Record
Foundation for Moral Law
1 Dexter Avenue
Montgomery, AL 36104

matt@morallaw.org
334-262-1245
Party name: Foundation for Moral Law
Blaine H. Evanson
    Counsel of Record
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
3161 Michelson Dr.
Irvine, CA 92612

bevanson@gibsondunn.com
949-451-3805
Party name: 92 Members of Congress
Kyle Douglas Hawkins
    Counsel of Record
Texas Attorney General's Office
P.O. Box 12548 (MC 059)
Austin, TX 78711-2548

kyle.hawkins@oag.texas.gov
5129361700
Party name: The States Of Texas, Alabama, Alaska, Arizona, Arkansas, Georgia, Kansas, Louisiana, Missouri, Montana, Oklahoma, South Carolina, South Dakota, Tennessee, Utah, And West Virginia
Jay Alan Sekulow
    Counsel of Record
American Center for Law and Justice
201 Maryland Avenue, N.E.
Washington, DC 20002

sekulow@aclj.org
(202) 546-8890
Party name: American Center for Law and Justice
Ilya Shapiro
    Counsel of Record
Cato Institute
1000 Massachusetts Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20001

ishapiro@cato.org
2028420200
Party name: The Cato Institute