No. 19-453
Vide 19-416
Title:Cargill, Inc., Petitioner
v.
John Doe I, et al.
Docketed:October 4, 2019
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-55435)
   Decision Date:July 5, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 02 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 4, 2019)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 23 2019Blanket Consent filed by Respondents, John Doe I, et al.VIDED
Blanket Consent
Oct 25 2019Waiver of right of respondents John Doe I, et al. to respond filed.
Main Document
Oct 28 2019Brief amicus curiae of The Coca-Cola Company filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 28 2019Brief amicus curiae of Washington Legal Foundation filed. VIDED
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 28 2019Brief amicus curiae of Chevron Corporation filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 28 2019Brief amici curiae of The Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, et al. filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 28 2019Brief amici curiae of The National Confectioners Association, et al. filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 30 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/15/2019.
Nov 04 2019Response Requested. (Due December 4, 2019)
Nov 14 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from December 4, 2019 to December 12, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Nov 19 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including December 12, 2019.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Andrew John Pincus
    Counsel of Record
Mayer Brown LLP
1999 K Street, NW
Washington, DC 20006

apincus@mayerbrown.com
202-263-3220
Party name: Cargill, Incorporated
Attorneys for Respondents
Paul Lindsey Hoffman
    Counsel of Record
Schonbrun Seplow Harris & Hoffman LLP
200 Pier Ave.
Hermosa Beach, CA 90254

hoffpaul@aol.com
3107177373
Party name: John Doe I, et al.
Other
John Bellinger Bellinger III
    Counsel of Record
Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer LLP
601 Massachusetts Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20001

john.bellinger@arnoldporter.com
202-942-6599
Party name: The Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, the National Foreign Trade Council, the National Association of Manufacturers, and the Organization for International Investment
Jack L. Goldsmith
    Counsel of Record
1563 Massachusetts Ave.
Cambridge, MA 02138

goldsmith.jack@gmail.com
(617) 384-8159
Party name: Chevron Corporation
Kevin Paul Martin
    Counsel of Record
Goodwin Procter LLP
100 Northern Avenue
Boston, MA 02210

kmartin@goodwinlaw.com
6175701000
Party name: The National Confectioners Association, the World Cocoa Foundation, and the European Cocoa Association
Richard A. Samp
    Counsel of Record
Washington Legal Foundation
2009 Massachusetts Ave., N.W.
Washington, DC 20036-0000

rsamp@wlf.org
202-588-0302
Party name: Washington Legal Foundation
Pratik Arvind Shah
    Counsel of Record
Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld, LLP
2001 K Street N.W.
Washington, DC 20006

pshah@akingump.com
202-887-4210
Party name: The Coca-Cola Company