No. 19-447
Title:Keith Puntenney, et al., Petitioners
v.
Iowa Utilities Board, et al.
Docketed:October 3, 2019
Linked with 19A193
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Iowa
   Case Numbers:(17-0423)
   Decision Date:May 31, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Aug 16 2019Application (19A193) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from August 29, 2019 to October 28, 2019, submitted to Justice Gorsuch.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Aug 19 2019Application (19A193) granted by Justice Gorsuch extending the time to file until September 30, 2019.
Aug 20 2019Corrected proof of service filed with respect to application for extension of time.
Main Document
Sep 30 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 4, 2019)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 10 2019Waiver of right of respondent Iowa Utilities Board to respond filed.
Main Document
Oct 16 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from November 4, 2019 to January 6, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Oct 16 2019Waiver of right of respondent Office of Consumer Advocate, Iowa Dept. of Justice to respond filed.
Main Document
Oct 17 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including January 6, 2020, for all respondents.
Oct 23 2019Waiver of right of respondent The MAIN Coalition to respond filed.
Main Document
Jan 06 2020Brief of respondent Dakota Access, LLC in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 20 2020Reply of petitioners Keith Puntenney, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 22 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/21/2020.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Eduardo Enrique Santacana
    Counsel of Record
Keker, Van Nest & Peters LLP
633 Battery St.
San Francisco, CA 94111

esantacana@keker.com
4153915400
Party name: Keith Puntenney, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
David John Debold
    Counsel of Record
Gibson Dunn & Crutcher LLP
1050 Connecticut Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20036

ddebold@gibsondunn.com
202-955-8551
Party name: Dakota Access, LLC
Matthew Charles McDermott
    Counsel of Record
Belin McCormick, P.C.
666 Walnut Street, Suite 2000
Des Moines, IA 50039

mmcdermott@belinmccormick.com
5152834643
Party name: The MAIN Coalition
Kim R. Snitker
    Counsel of Record
Iowa Utilities Board
1375 East Couirt Avenue
Des Moines, IA 50319-0069

kim.snitker@iub.iowa.gov
515-725-0552
Party name: Iowa Utilities Board
John S. LongOffice of Consumer Advocate, Iowa Dept. of Justice
1375 E. Court Ave.
Des Moines, LA 50319

John.Long@oca.iowa.gov
515-722-7200
Party name: Office of Consumer Advocate, Iowa Dept. of Justice