No. 19-440
Title:Northern Trust Corporation, et al., Petitioners
v.
Lindie L. Banks, et al.
Docketed:October 2, 2019
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-56025)
   Decision Date:July 5, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 02 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 1, 2019)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 29 2019Waiver of right of respondents Lindie L. Banks, et al. to respond filed.
Main Document
Oct 31 2019Motion for leave to file amici brief filed by American Bankers Association, et al.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Nov 06 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/22/2019.
Nov 18 2019Response Requested. (Due December 18, 2019)
Dec 10 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from December 18, 2019 to January 17, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Dec 12 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including January 17, 2020.
Jan 17 2020Brief of respondents Lindie L. Banks, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 04 2020Reply of petitioners Northern Trust Corporation and Northern Trust Company filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 05 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/21/2020.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Ian Heath Gershengorn
    Counsel of Record
Jenner & Block
1099 New York Ave., NW
Suite 900
Washington, DC 20001

IGershengorn@jenner.com
202-639-6869
Party name: Northern Trust Corporation and Northern Trust Company
Attorneys for Respondents
Brian J. Malloy
    Counsel of Record
The Brandi Law Firm
354 Pine Street
Third Floor
San Francisco, CA 94104

bjm@brandilaw.com
14159891800
Party name: Lindie L. Banks, et al.
Other
Matthew Allen Fitzgerald
    Counsel of Record
McGuireWoods LLP
800 East Canal Street
Gateway Plaza
Richmond, VA 23219

mfitzgerald@mcguirewoods.com
(804)775-4716
Party name: American Bankers Association, et al.