No. 19-438
Title:Clemente Avelino Pereida, Petitioner
v.
William P. Barr, Attorney General
Docketed:October 2, 2019
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eighth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-3377)
   Decision Date:March 1, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:July 2, 2019
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Sep 30 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 1, 2019)
PetitionAppendix
Sep 30 2019Pursuant to Rule 34.6 and Paragraph 9 of the Guidelines for the Submission of Documents to the Supreme Court's Electronic Filing System, filings in this case should be submitted in paper form only, and should not be submitted through the Court's electronic filing system.
Oct 24 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from November 1, 2019 to December 2, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Oct 25 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including December 2, 2019.
Nov 12 2019Brief of respondent William P. Barr, Attorney General filed.
Nov 25 2019Reply of petitioner Clemente A. Pereida filed.
Main Document
Nov 26 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/13/2019.
Dec 18 2019Petition GRANTED.
Dec 18 2019As Rule 34.6 provides, “If the Court schedules briefing and oral argument in a case that was governed by Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 5.2(c) or Federal Rule of Criminal Procedure 49.1(c), the parties shall submit electronic versions of all prior and subsequent filings with this Court in the case, subject to [applicable] redaction rules.” Subsequent party and amicus filings in the case should now be submitted through the Court’s electronic filing system, with any necessary redactions.
Jan 10 2020Motion to dispense with printing the joint appendix filed by petitioner Clemente A. Pereida.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jan 28 2020Brief of petitioner Clemente A. Pereida filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 31 2020SET FOR ARGUMENT on Monday, March 30, 2020.
Feb 04 2020Brief amici curiae of National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 04 2020Brief amici curiae of Former United States Immigration Judges and Members of the Board of Immigration Appeals filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 04 2020Brief amici curiae of Immigration Law Professors filed.
Main DocumentOtherCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 04 2020Brief amici curiae of Immigrant Defense Project, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 19 2020CIRCULATED
Feb 19 2020Record requested from the U.S.C.A. 8th Circuit.
Feb 24 2020Motion to dispense with printing the joint appendix filed by petitioner GRANTED.
Feb 26 2020Record received from the U.S.C.A. 8th Circuit. (1-Box)
Feb 27 2020Brief of respondent William P. Barr, Attorney General filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of Service
Mar 04 2020Brief amicus curiae of Immigration Reform Law Institute filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 16 2020ORAL ARGUMENT POSTPONED.
Mar 30 2020Reply of petitioner Clemente A. Pereida filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 13 2020Argument to be rescheduled for the October Term 2020.
Jul 13 2020SET FOR ARGUMENT on Wednesday, October 14, 2020.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Brian Philip Goldman
    Counsel of Record
Orrick, Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP
405 Howard Street
San Francisco, CA 94105

brian.goldman@orrick.com
415-773-5676
Party name: Clemente A. Pereida
Attorneys for Respondent
Jeffrey B. Wall
    Counsel of Record
Acting Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Barr, Att'y Gen.
Other
Alina Das
    Counsel of Record
Washington Square Legal Services
245 Sullivan Street
5th Floor
New York, NY 10012

alina.das@nyu.edu
3476936485
Party name: Immigration Law Professors
Lawrence J. Joseph
    Counsel of Record
Law Office of Lawrence J. Joseph
1250 Connecticut Avenue, NW
Suite 700-1A
Washington, DC 20036

ljoseph@larryjoseph.com
2023559452
Party name: Immigration Reform Law Instiute
David G. Keyko
    Counsel of Record
Pillsbury Winthrop Shaw Pittman LLP
31 West 52nd Street
New York, NY 10019-6131

david.keyko@pillsburylaw.com
212-858-1604
Party name: Former United States Immigration Judges and Members of the Board of Immigration Appeals
David Sapir Lesser
    Counsel of Record
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale and Dorr LLP
7 World Trade Center
New York, NY 10007

David.Lesser@wilmerhale.com
(212) 230-8851
Party name: National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers and National Association of Federal Defenders
Jayashri Srikantiah
    Counsel of Record
Stanford Law School Immigrants' Rights Clinic
559 Nathan Abbott Way
Stanford, CA 94305

jsrikantiah@law.stanford.edu
6507242442
Party name: Immigrant Defense Project, American Immigration Lawyers Association, National Immigrant Justice Center, Immigrant Legal Resource Center, National Immigration Project of the National Lawyers Guild