No. 19-433
Title:Patrick Emanuel Sutherland, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:October 2, 2019
Linked with 19A144
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-4427)
   Decision Date:April 19, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:May 17, 2019
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Aug 05 2019Application (19A144) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from August 15, 2019 to September 30, 2019, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Aug 07 2019Application (19A144) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until September 30, 2019.
Sep 30 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 1, 2019)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 22 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from November 1, 2019 to December 2, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Oct 23 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including December 2, 2019.
Nov 22 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from December 2, 2019 to January 2, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Nov 25 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including January 2, 2020.
Jan 02 2020Brief of respondent United States of America in opposition filed.
Certificate of Word CountMain Document
Jan 21 2020Reply of petitioner Patrick Emanuel Sutherland filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 22 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/21/2020.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Barry J. Pollack
    Counsel of Record
Robbins, Russell, Englert, Orseck, Untereiner & Sauber LLP
2000 K Street, N.W.
4th Floor
Washington, DC 20006

bpollack@robbinsrussell.com
202-775-4500
Party name: Patrick Emanuel Sutherland
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States of America