No. 19-431
Vide 19-454
Title:Little Sisters of the Poor Saints Peter and Paul Home, Petitioner
v.
Pennsylvania, et al.
Docketed:October 2, 2019
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Third Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-3752, 18-1253, 19-1129, 19-1189)
   Decision Date:July 12, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 01 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 1, 2019)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 08 2019Blanket Consent filed by Petitioners, The Little Sisters of the Poor Saints Peter and Paul Home.
Blanket Consent
Oct 22 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from November 1, 2019 to December 16, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Oct 23 2019Letter of October 23, 2019 from counsel for petitioners received.
Oct 24 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted in part; the time is extended to and including December 9, 2019.
Oct 28 2019Brief amici curiae of Residents and Families of Residents at Homes of the Little Sisters of the Poor filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 31 2019Brief amicus curiae of Foundation for Moral Law filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 01 2019Brief amici curiae of 92 Members of Congress filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 01 2019Brief amicus curiae of Christian Legal Society filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 01 2019Brief amici curiae of United States Conference of Catholic Bishops, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 01 2019Brief amici curiae of The Cato Institute filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 01 2019Brief amicus curiae of First Liberty Institute filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 05 2019Brief amici curiae of The States Of Texas,et al. filed. VIDED. (11/5/2019)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Nov 05 2019Amicus brief of The States Of Texas, Alabama, Alaska, Arizona, Arkansas, Georgia, Kansas, Louisiana, Missouri, Montana, Oklahoma, South Carolina, South Dakota, Tennessee, Utah, And West Virginia not accepted for filing. (November 04, 2019)(Corrected version submitted)
Dec 09 2019Brief of respondents Commonwealth of Pennsylvania et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 20 2019Reply of petitioner The Little Sisters of the Poor Saints Peter and Paul Home filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 23 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/10/2020.
Jan 13 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/17/2020.
Jan 17 2020Petition GRANTED. The petition for a writ of certiorari in No. 19-454 is granted. The cases are consolidated, and a total of one hour is allotted for oral argument. VIDED.
Jan 17 2020Because the Court has consolidated these cases for briefing and oral argument, future filings and activity in the cases will now be reflected on the docket of No. 19-431. Subsequent filings in these cases must therefore be submitted through the electronic filing system in No. 19-431. Each document submitted in connection with one or more of these cases must include on its cover the case number and caption for each case in which the filing is intended to be submitted. Where a filing is submitted in fewer than all of the cases, the docket entry will reflect the case number(s) in which the filing is submitted; a document filed in all of the consolidated cases will be noted as “VIDED.”
Feb 20 2020Blanket Consent filed by Federal respondents. VIDED.
Blanket Consent
Feb 21 2020SET FOR ARGUMENT on Wednesday, April 29, 2020. VIDED.
Feb 21 2020Blanket Consent filed by Petitioners, The Little Sisters of the Poor Saints Peter and Paul Home. VIDED.
Blanket Consent
Feb 21 2020Blanket Consent filed by Respondents, Commonwealth of Pennsylvania et al. VIDED.
Blanket Consent
Feb 26 2020Record requested from the U.S.C.A. 3rd Circuit.
Feb 27 2020Brief amicus curiae of Foundation for Moral Law filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 02 2020Brief of petitioner The Little Sisters of the Poor Saints Peter and Paul Home filed (in 19-431).
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 02 2020Brief of Donald J. Trump, President of the United States, et al. filed (in 19-454).
Main DocumentCertificate of Word Count
Mar 02 2020Motion for leave to dispense with printing the joint appendix in No. 19-454 filed (in 19-454).
Main DocumentProof of Service
Mar 02 2020Brief amici curiae of Residents and Families of Residents at Homes of the Little Sisters of the Poor filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 02 2020Brief amici curiae of Inner Life Fund and Institute for Faith and Family filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 04 2020Brief amici curiae of United States Conference of Catholic Bishops, et al. filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 05 2020Motion for leave to dispense with printing the joint appendix in No. 19-431 filed by petitioner (in 19-431).
Main DocumentProof of Service
Mar 05 2020Amicus brief of The Cato Institute not accepted for filing. (Corrected brief submitted - March 17, 2020)
Mar 05 2020Brief amici curiae of The Cato Institute and Jewish Coalition for Religious Liberty filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 06 2020Brief amicus curiae of The Catholic Benefits Association filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 09 2020Motion to dispense with printing the joint appendix in No. 19-454 filed by petitioners GRANTED.
Mar 09 2020Brief amicus curiae of March for Life Education and Defense Fund filed. VIDED
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 09 2020Brief amicus curiae of Independent Women's Law Center filed. VIDED
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 09 2020Brief amicus curiae of New Civil Liberties Alliance filed. VIDED
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 09 2020Brief amici curiae of Nicholas Bagley and Samuel L. Bray filed (in 19-454).
Main DocumentProof of Service
Mar 09 2020Brief amici curiae of Christian Legal Society, et al. filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 09 2020Brief amici curiae of Constitutional Law Scholars filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 09 2020Brief amicus curiae of First Liberty Institute filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 09 2020Brief amici curiae of Michael Stokes Paulsen and Kevin C. Walsh filed (in 19-431).
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 09 2020Brief amici curiae of The International Society for Krishna Consciousness, Inc., et al. filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 09 2020Brief amicus curiae of Christian Business Owners Supporting Religious Freedom filed (in 19-431).
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 09 2020Brief amici curiae of 161 Members of Congress filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 09 2020Brief amici curiae of Women Scholars filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 09 2020Brief amici curiae of The Catholic Association Foundation, et al. filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 09 2020Brief amici curiae of The States Of Texas, et al. filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 09 2020Brief amicus curiae of Professor Douglas Laycock filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 09 2020Brief amicus curiae of American Center for Law and Justice filed. VIDED
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 09 2020Brief amicus curiae of The Knights of Columbus filed. VIDED
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 09 2020Brief amicus curiae of Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 19 2020CIRCULATED
Mar 19 2020The record received from the U.S.C.A. 3rd Circuit has been electronically filed.
Mar 23 2020Motion to dispense with printing the joint appendix in No. 19-431 filed by petitioner GRANTED.
Apr 01 2020Brief of respondents Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, et al. filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 03 2020ORAL ARGUMENT POSTPONED. VIDED.
Apr 03 2020Brief amici curiae of CHILD USA, et al. filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 07 2020Brief amici curiae of Center for Health Law & Policy Innovation of Harvard Law School, et al. filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 08 2020Motion for divided argument filed by the Solicitor General. VIDED.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Apr 08 2020Brief amici curiae of Professors of Civil Procedure and Federal Courts filed (in 19-454). (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 08 2020Brief amici curiae of National League of Cities, United States Conference of Mayers, International City/County Management Association and International Municipal Lawyers Association filed (in 19-454). (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 08 2020Brief amici curiae of Church-State Scholars filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 08 2020Brief amicus curiae of The Guttmacher Institute filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Proof of ServiceMain DocumentCertificate of Word Count
Apr 08 2020Brief amici curiae of The American Civil Liberties Union, et al. filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 08 2020Brief amici curiae of Administrative Law Scholars filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 08 2020Brief amicus curiae of American Academy of Pediatrics filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 08 2020Brief amici curiae of 186 Members of the United States Congress filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 08 2020Brief amici curiae of Massachusetts, et al., filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 08 2020Brief amici curiae of Catholics For Choice, et al. filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Apr 08 2020Brief amicus curiae of Yale Law School Program for the Study of Reproductive Justice filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 08 2020Brief amici curiae of Professors of Criminal Law, Former State Attorneys General, and Former United States Department of Justice Officials filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 08 2020Brief amici curiae of U.S. Women’s Chamber of Commerce, National Association for Female Executives and Businesses filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 08 2020Brief amicus curiae of Public Citizen filed (in 19-454). (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 08 2020Brief amici curiae of Lambda Legal Defense and Education Fund, Inc. and Human Rights Campaign filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountCertificate of Word Count
Apr 08 2020Brief amici curiae of Military Historians filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 08 2020Brief amici curiae of Public Interest Law Center and Five Affiliated Lawyers' Committees filed (in 19-454). (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 08 2020Brief amici curiae of Phyllis C. Borzi and Daniel J. Maguire filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 08 2020Brief amici curiae of Cities of Oakland, St. Paul, and 30 Additional Cities and Counties filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 08 2020Brief amici curiae of The National Women’s Law Center, et al. filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 08 2020Brief amicus curiae of Professor Mila Sohoni filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 08 2020Brief amici curiae of American College of Obstetricians and Gynecologists, et al. filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 08 2020Brief amicus curiae of Prof. Martin S. Lederman filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 08 2020Brief amici curiae of Legal Scholars filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 08 2020Brief amici curiae of Planned Parenthood Federation of America, et al. filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 08 2020Brief amici curiae of Religious and Civil-Rights Organizations filed. VIDED. (Distributed). (Corrected brief and PDF filed).
Apr 08 2020Brief amici curiae of Religious and Civil-Rights Organizations filed (April 20, 2020). VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 08 2020Brief amici curiae of Center for Inquiry, Inc., et al. filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 08 2020Brief amici curiae of American Association of University Women, et al. filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 08 2020Brief amicus curiae of Howard University School of Law, Civil and Human Rights Clinic filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 13 2020Argument to be rescheduled for May 2020. VIDED.
Apr 15 2020RESCHEDULED FOR ARGUMENT on Wednesday, May 6, 2020. VIDED.
Apr 20 2020Motion of the Solicitor General for divided argument GRANTED. VIDED.
Apr 24 2020Reply of petitioner The Little Sisters of the Poor Saints Peter and Paul Home filed (in 19-431). (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 26 2020Reply of petitioners Donald J. Trump, et al. filed (in 19-454). (Distributed)
Certificate of Word CountMain Document
May 06 2020Argued. For petitioners in 19-454: Noel J. Francisco, Solicitor General, Department of Justice, Washington, D.C. For petitioner in 19-431: Paul D. Clement, Washington, D. C. For respondents: Michael J. Fischer, Chief Deputy Attorney General, Philadelphia, Pa. VIDED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Mark Leonard Rienzi
    Counsel of Record
The Becket Fund for Religious Liberty
1200 New Hampshire Ave., NW
Suite 700
Washington, DC 20036

mrienzi@becketlaw.org
2023497208
Party name: The Little Sisters of the Poor Saints Peter and Paul Home
Attorneys for Respondents
Michael J. Fischer
    Counsel of Record
Pennsylvania Office of Attorney General
1600 Arch St.
Suite 300
Philadelphia, PA 19103

mfischer@attorneygeneral.gov
215-560-2171
Party name: Commonwealth of Pennsylvania et al.
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Federal respondents
Other
Brigitte Adrienne Amiri
    Counsel of Record
American Civil Liberties Union Foundation
125 Broad Street
18th Floor
New York, NY 10004-2427

bamiri@aclu.org
2125197897
Party name: The American Civil Liberties Union, et al
Steven Edwards Art
    Counsel of Record
Loevy & Loevy
311 N. Aberdeen St., 3rd Fl.
Chicago, IL 60607

steve@loevy.com
312-243-5900
Party name: Professors - Zachary D. Clopton, Amanda Frost, Suzette Malveaux, Alan Trammell
Jeffrey Blumenfeld
    Counsel of Record
Lowenstein Sandler LLP
2200 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20037

jblumenfeld@lowenstein.com
202-753-3810
Party name: The National Women’s Law Center, the National Asian Pacific American Women’s Forum, the National Latina Institute for Reproductive Justice, SisterLove, Inc. and 50 Additional Organizations
Leah R. Bruno
    Counsel of Record
Dentons US LLP
233 South Wacker Drive, Suite 5900
Chicago, IL 60606

leah.bruno@dentons.com
(312) 876-8000
Party name: U.S. Women’s Chamber of Commerce, National Association for Female Executives and Businesses
Kevin Michael Costello
    Counsel of Record
Center for Health Law & Policy Innovation of Harvard Law School
1585 Massachusetts Avenue
Cambridge, MA 02138

kcostello@law.harvard.edu
6174960901
Party name: Center for Health Law & Policy Innovation of Harvard Law School, et al.
Elizabeth Napier Dewar
    Counsel of Record
One Ashburton Place
Boston, MA 02108

bessie.dewar@mass.gov
617-963-2204
Party name: Massachusetts, et al.,
Christopher Egleson
    Counsel of Record
Sidley Austin LLP
555 West Fifth Street
Los Angeles, CA 90013

cegleson@sidley.com
(213) 896-6108
Party name: Professor Mila Sohoni
Brianne Jenna Gorod
    Counsel of Record
Constitutional Accountability Center
1200 18th Street, NW
Suite 501
Washington, DC 20036

brianne@theusconstitution.org
202 296 6889
Party name: Military Historians
M. Duncan Grant
    Counsel of Record
Pepper Hamilton LLP
3000 Two Logan Square
Philadelphia, PA 19103

grantm@pepperlaw.com
2159814343
Party name: The Guttmacher Institute
Leslie Carol Griffin
    Counsel of Record
University of Nevada, Las Vegas William S. Boyd School of Law
4505 S. Maryland Parkway
Box 451003
Las Vegas, NV 89154-1003

leslie.griffin@unlv.edu
7028952071
Party name: CHILD USA et al.
Claudia Lesley Hammerman
    Counsel of Record
Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison LLP
1285 Avenue of the Americas
New York, NY 10019-6064

chammerman@paulweiss.com
212-373-3000
Party name: Planned Parenthood Federation of America, National Health Law Program, National Family Planning and Reproductive Health Association, Raising Women's Voices for the Health Care We Need
Thomas Warnes Hazlett
    Counsel of Record
Ballard Spahr LLP
1735 Market Street, 51st Floor
Philadelphia, PA 19103-7599

hazlettt@ballardspahr.com
215.665.8500
Party name: Public Interest Law Center and Five Affiliated Lawyers' Committees
Beatrice Jessie Hill
    Counsel of Record
Case Western Reserve University School of Law
11075 East Blvd.
Cleveland, OH 44106

bjh11@case.edu
2163680553
Party name: Catholics For Choice, et al.
Elizabeth Hopkins
    Counsel of Record
Kantor & Kantor, LLP
19839 Nordhoff Street
Northridge, CA 91324

ehopkins@kantorlaw.net
818 886-2525
Party name: Phyllis C. Borzi and Daniel J. Maguire
Nandan Maheshchandra Joshi
    Counsel of Record
Public Citizen Litigation Group
1600 20th Street, NW
Washington, DC 20009

njoshi@citizen.org
2025887733
Party name: Public Citizen
Richard Brian Katskee
    Counsel of Record
Americans United for Separation of Church and State
1310 L St. NW
Ste. 200
Washington, DC 20005

katskee@au.org
202-466-7304
Party name: Religious and Civil-Rights Organizations
Michael B. Kimberly
    Counsel of Record
MCDERMOTT WILL & EMERY
500 North Capitol Street, NW
The McDermott Building
Washington, DC 20001

mkimberly@mwe.com
(202) 756-8901
Party name: Legal Scholars
Martin Seth Lederman
    Counsel of Record
600 New Jersey Avenue NW
Washington, DC 20001

martin.lederman@law.georgetown.edu
3012216618
Party name: Prof. Martin S. Lederman
Joshua Adam Matz
    Counsel of Record
Kaplan Hecker & Fink LLP
350 Fifth Avenue, Suite 7110
New York, NY 10118

jmatz@kaplanhecker.com
(212) 763-0883
Party name: Church-State Scholars
Jonathan B. Miller
    Counsel of Record
Public Rights Project
1721 Broadway
#201
Oakland, CA 94612

jon@publicrightsproject.org
6468316113
Party name: Cities of Oakland, St. Paul, and 30 Additional Cities and Counties
Jonathan B. Miller
    Counsel of Record
Public Rights Project
1721 Broadway
#201
Oakland, CA 94612

jon@publicrightsproject.org
6468316113
Party name: City of St. Paul, Minnesota
David A. O'Neil
    Counsel of Record
Debevoise & Plimpton LLP
801 Pennsylvania Avenue N.W. – Suite 500
Washington, DC 20004

daoneil@debevoise.com
(202) 383-8000
Party name: 186 Members of the United States Congress
Jennifer C. Pizer
    Counsel of Record
Lambda Legal Defense and Education Fund, Inc.
4221 Wilshire Blvd., Suite 280
Los Angeles, CA 90010

jpizer@lambdalegal.org
2135905903
Party name: Lambda Legal Defense and Education Fund, Inc. and Human Rights Campaign
Wesley R. Powell
    Counsel of Record
Willkie Farr & Gallagher LLP
787 Seventh Avenue
New York, NY 10019

wpowell@willkie.com
2127288264
Party name: Professors of Criminal Law, Former State Attorneys General, and Former United States Department of Justice Officials
Ajmel Ahsen Quereshi
    Counsel of Record
Howard University School of Law
2900 Van Ness St., N.W.
Washington, DC 20008

ajmel.quereshi@howard.edu
(202) 806-8082
Party name: Howard University School of Law, Civil and Human Rights Clinic
Devi Maheswari Rao
    Counsel of Record
Jenner & Block, LLP
1099 New York Ave., NW
Suite 900
Washingon, DC 20001

DRao@jenner.com
202-637-6390
Party name: American Academy of Pediatrics
Bruce H. Schneider
    Counsel of Record
Stroock & Stroock & Lavan LLP
180 Maiden Lane
New York, NY 10038

bschneider@stroock.com
(212) 806-5400
Party name: American College of Obstetricians and Gynecologists, American Nurses Association, American Academy of Nursing, Physicians for Reproductive Health, and Nurses for Sexual and Reproductive Health
Elliott Schulder
    Counsel of Record
Covington & Burling LLP
850 Tenth Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20001

eschulder@cov.com
202-662-5462
Party name: Administrative Law Scholars
James Reid Sigel
    Counsel of Record
Morrison & Foerster LLP
425 Market St.
San Francisco, CA 94105

JSigel@mofo.com
415-268-6948
Party name: American Association of University Women; the American Federation of State, County, and Municipal Employees; and 14 Additional Professional, Labor, and Student Associations
Priscilla J. Smith
    Counsel of Record
Yale Law School
319 Sterling Place
Brooklyn, NY 11238

priscilla.smith@yale.edu
347-262-5177
Party name: Yale Law School Program for the Study of Reproductive Justice
Lisa E. Soronen
    Counsel of Record
State and Local Legal Center
444 North Capitol Street, NW
Suite 515
Washington, DC 20001

lsoronen@sso.org
2024344845
Party name: National League of Cities, United States Conference of Mayers, International City/County Management Association and International Municipal Lawyers Association
Edward Z. Tabash
    Counsel of Record
11500 West Olympic Blvd
Suite 400
Los Angeles, CA 90064

etabash@centerforinquiry.org
3102795120
Party name: Center for Inquiry, Inc.
Helen M. Alvare
    Counsel of Record
George Mason University School of Law
3301 Fairfax Drive
Arlington, VA 22201

halvare@gmu.edu
703 9939845
Party name: Women Scholars
Joshua Michael Blackman
    Counsel of Record
1303 San Jacinto Street
Houston, TX 77002

josh@joshblackman.com
2022949003
Party name: The Cato Institute
Donald Burke
    Counsel of Record
Robbins, Russell, Englert, Orseck, Untereiner & Sauber LLP
2000 K St NW, 4th Floor
Washington, DC 20006

dburke@robbinsrussell.com
202-775-4491
Party name: Nicholas Bagley and Samuel L. Bray
John J. Bursch
    Counsel of Record
Alliance Defending Freedom
440 First Street NW
Suite 600
Washington, DC 20001

jbursch@adflegal.org
(616) 450-4235
Party name: March for Life Education and Defense Fund
Anthony Thomas Caso
    Counsel of Record
Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence
One University Drive
Orange, CA 92866

caso@chapman.edu
877-855-3330
Party name: Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence
Matthew James Clark
    Counsel of Record
Foundation for Moral Law
1 Dexter Avenue
Montgomery, AL 36104

matt@morallaw.org
334-262-1245
Party name: Foundation for Moral Law
Miles Edward Coleman
    Counsel of Record
Nelson Mullins Riley & Scarborough, LLP
2 West Washington Street
Suite 400
Greenville, SC 29601

miles.coleman@nelsonmullins.com
8643732352
Party name: Constitutional Law Scholars
Dwight Gerard Duncan
    Counsel of Record
University of Massachusetts
School of Law
333 Faunce Corner Road
North Dartmouth, MA 02747

dduncan@umassd.edu
508-985-1124
Party name: Residents and Families of Residents at Homes of the Little Sisters of the Poor
Blaine H. Evanson
    Counsel of Record
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
3161 Michelson Dr.
Irvine, CA 92612

bevanson@gibsondunn.com
949-451-3805
Party name: 161 Members of Congress
Blaine H. Evanson
    Counsel of Record
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
3161 Michelson Dr.
Irvine, CA 92612

bevanson@gibsondunn.com
949-451-3805
Party name: 92 Members of Congress
Richard Shawn Gunnarson
    Counsel of Record
Kirton McConkie
Key Bank Tower
36 South State Street, Suite 1900
Salt Lake City, UT 84111

sgunnarson@kmclaw.com
801-323-5907
Party name: United States Conference of Catholic Bishops, et al.
Kyle Douglas Hawkins
    Counsel of Record
Texas Attorney General's Office
P.O. Box 12548 (MC 059)
Austin, TX 78711-2548

kyle.hawkins@oag.texas.gov
5129361700
Party name: The States Of Texas, Alabama, Alaska, Arizona, Arkansas, Georgia, Kansas, Louisiana, Missouri, Montana, Oklahoma, South Carolina, South Dakota, Tennessee, Utah, And West Virginia
James L. Hirsen
    Counsel of Record
505 S. Villa Real Drive
Suite 101
Anaheim Hills, CA 92807

james@jameshirsen.com
714-614-0401
Party name: Inner Life Fund and Institute for Faith and Family
Scott A. Keller
    Counsel of Record
Baker Botts LLP
700 K St. NW
Washington, DC 20001

scott.keller@bakerbotts.com
2026397700
Party name: Professor Douglas Laycock
Eric Nieuwenhuis Kniffin
    Counsel of Record
Lewis Roca Rothgerber Christie LLP
90 South Cascade Avenue, Suite 1100
Colorado Springs, CO 80903

ekniffin@lrrc.com
7193863017
Party name: The Knights of Columbus
Matthew Theodore Martens
    Counsel of Record
WilmerHale
1875 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20006

matthew.martens@wilmerhale.com
202-663-6000
Party name: Christian Legal Society
Thomas Ryan McCarthy
    Counsel of Record
Consovoy McCarthy PLLC
1600 Wilson Boulevard
Suite 700
Arlington, VA 22209

tom@consovoymccarthy.com
7032439423
Party name: First Liberty Institute
Erin Elizabeth Mersino
    Counsel of Record
Great Lakes Justice Center
5600 W. Mount Hope Hwy.
Lansing, MI 48917

eb8181@yahoo.com
917-826-8469
Party name: Christian Business Owners Supporting Religious Freedom
L. Martin Nussbaum
    Counsel of Record
Nussbaum Speir Gleason PLLC
2 N. Cascade Ave.
Ste. 1430
Colorado Springs, CO 80903-1662

martin@nussbaumspeir.com
7194281919
Party name: The Catholic Benefits Association
Andrea Marie Picciotti-Bayer
    Counsel of Record
Catholic Association Foundation
3220 N. Street NW, Suite 126
Washington, DC 20007

amariepicciotti@gmail.com
5712016564
Party name: The Catholic Association Foundation, et al.
Richard A. Samp
    Counsel of Record
New Civil Liberties Alliance
1225 19th Street NW, Suite 450
Washington, DC 20036

rasamp@verizon.net
202-869-5210
Party name: New Civil Liberties Alliance
Gene Clayton Schaerr
    Counsel of Record
Schaerr | Jaffe
1717 K Street NW, Suite 900
Washington, DC 20006

gschaerr@schaerr-jaffe.com
202-787-1060
Party name: The International Society for Krishna Consciousness, Inc., the Coalition for Jewish Values, Asma T. Uddin, Pastor Robert Soto, and Imam Ossama Bahloul
Brian David Schmalzbach
    Counsel of Record
McGuireWoods LLP
800 East Canal Street
Richmond, VA 23219

bschmalzbach@mcguirewoods.com
804-775-4746
Party name: Michael Stokes Paulsen and Kevin C. Walsh
Jay Alan Sekulow
    Counsel of Record
American Center for Law and Justice
201 Maryland Avenue, N.E.
Washington, DC 20002

jsekulow@claglaw.com
2022485407
Party name: American Center for Law and Justice
Kelly J. ShackelfordFirst Liberty Institute
2001 W Piano Pkwy
Suite 1600
Plano, TX 75075

kshackelford@firstliberty.org
972-941-4444
Party name: First Liberty Institute
David H. Thompson
    Counsel of Record
Cooper & Kirk, PLLC
1523 New Hampshire Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC 20036

dthompson@cooperkirk.com
202-220-9600
Party name: Independent Women's Law Center