No. 19-430
Title:Athena Diagnostics, Inc., et al., Petitioners
v.
Mayo Collaborative Services, LLC, dba Mayo Medical Laboratories, et al.
Docketed:October 2, 2019
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
   Case Numbers:(2017-2508)
   Decision Date:February 6, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:July 3, 2019
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 01 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 1, 2019)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 03 2019Blanket Consent filed by Petitioners, Athena Diagnostics, Inc., et al.
Blanket Consent
Oct 14 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from November 1, 2019 to November 22, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Oct 16 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including November 22, 2019.
Oct 18 2019Brief amicus curiae of New York Intellectual Property Law Association filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 29 2019Brief amici curiae of Professors Jeffrey A. Lefstin and Peter S. Menell filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 31 2019Brief amicus curiae of Intellectual Property Law Association of Chicago filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 31 2019Brief amicus curiae of The Chartered Institute of Patent Attorneys filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 31 2019Brief amicus curiae of Biotechnology Innovation Organization filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Nov 01 2019Brief amici curiae of Freenome Holdings, Inc. and New Cures For Cancers, Inc. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 01 2019Brief amicus curiae of Blaine Laboratories, Inc., in support on neither party filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 01 2019Brief amicus curiae of Pharmaceutical Research and Manufacturers of America filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 01 2019Brief amici curiae of The Chicago Patent Attorneys filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 01 2019Brief amicus curiae of Intellectual Property Owners Association filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Nov 01 2019Amicus brief of Honorable Paul R. Michel (ret.) not accepted for filing. (November 07, 2019 -- Corrected version to be submitted)
Nov 07 2019Amicus brief of Honorable Paul R. Michel (ret.) submitted.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountCertificate of Word Count

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Seth P. Waxman
    Counsel of Record
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale and Dorr LLP
1875 Pennsylvania Ave, NW
Washington, DC 20006

Seth.Waxman@wilmerhale.com
202-663-6800
Party name: Athena Diagnostics, Inc., et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Jonathan E. Singer
    Counsel of Record
Fish & Richardson, P.C., P.A.
12390 El Camino Real
San Diego, CA 92130

singer@fr.com
858-678-5070
Party name: Mayo Collaborative Services, LLC, et al.
Other
Meredith Martin Addy
    Counsel of Record
AddyHart, P.C.
10 Glenlake Parkway
Suite 130
Atlanta, GA 30328

meredith@addyhart.com
3123204200
Party name: Freenome Holdings, Inc. and New Cures For Cancers, Inc.
Mark J. Abate
    Counsel of Record
Goodwin Procter LLP
620 Eighth Avenue
New York, NY 10018-1405

mabate@goodwinlaw.com
212-813-8800
Party name: Intellectual Property Owners Association
David L. Applegate
    Counsel of Record
Williams Montgomery & John Ltd.
233 South Wacker Drive
Suite 6800
Chicago, IL 60606

dla@willmont.com
312-443-3200
Party name: Intellectual Property Law Association of Chicago
Corinne Elisabeth Atton
    Counsel of Record
Venable LLP
1290 Avenue of the Americas, 20th Floor
New York, NY 10104

catton@venable.com
2122182100
Party name: Biotechnology Innovation Organization
Matthew James Dowd
    Counsel of Record
Dowd Scheffel PLLC
1717 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Suite 1025
Washington, DC 20006

mdowd@dowdscheffel.com
202-573-3853
Party name: Honorable Paul R. Michel (ret.)
Kirk M. Hartung
    Counsel of Record
McKee, Voorhees & Sease, PLC
801 Grand Avenue
Suite 3200
Des Moines, IA 50309-2721

kirk.hartung@ipmvs.com
515-288-3667
Party name: Blaine Laboratories, Inc.
Robert Allen Long Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Covington & Burling, LLP
One CityCenter
850 Tenth St., NW
Washington, DC 20001

rlong@cov.com
202-662-5612
Party name: Pharmaceutical Research and Manufacturers of America
Peter S. Menell
    Counsel of Record
University of California
Univ. of California, Berkeley School of Law
225 Bancroft Way
Berkeley, CA 94720-7200

pmenell@law.berkeley.edu
5106425489
Party name: Professors Jeffrey A. Lefstin and Peter S. Menell
Kevin Edward Noonan
    Counsel of Record
McDonnell Boehnen Hulbert & Berghoff LLP
300 South Wacker Drive, Suite 3100
Chicago, IL 60606

noonan@mbhb.com
312-913-0001
Party name: The Chicago Patent Attorneys
Irena Royzman
    Counsel of Record
Kramer Levin Naftalis & Frankel LLP
1177 Avenue of the Americas
New York, NY 10036

iroyzman@kramerlevin.com
(212) 715-9152
Party name: New York Intellectual Property Law Association
Michael Stanley Tomsa
    Counsel of Record
McAndrews, Held & Malloy
500 West Madison Street - Suite 3400
Chicago, IL 60661

MTomsa@mcandrews-ip.com
3127758081
Party name: The Chartered Institute of Patent Attorneys