No. 19-417
Title:EMW Women's Surgical Center, P.S.C., et al., Petitioners
v.
Adam Meier
Docketed:September 27, 2019
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-6151, 17-6183)
   Decision Date:April 4, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:June 28, 2019
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Sep 25 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 28, 2019)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 28 2019Brief amicus curiae of American Public Health Association filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 28 2019Brief amici curiae of American College of Obstetricians and Gynecologists,et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 28 2019Brief of respondent ADAM MEIER in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 28 2019Brief amici curiae of Biomedical Ethicists Ruth R. Faden, Ph.D. M.P.H., et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Alexa Kolbi-Molinas
    Counsel of Record
American Civil Liberties Union
125 Broad Street, 18th Floor
New York, NY 10004

akolbi-molinas@aclu.org
2125197845
Party name: EMW WOMEN’S SURGICAL CENTER, P.S.C., et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Stephen Chad Meredith
    Counsel of Record
Commonwealth of Kentucky, Office of the Governor
700 Capitol Avenue, Room 101
Frankfort, KY 40601

chad.meredith@ky.gov
502-564-2611
Party name: ADAM MEIER
Other
Beatrice Jessie Hill
    Counsel of Record
Case Western Reserve University School of Law
11075 East Blvd.
Cleveland, OH 44106

bjh11@case.edu
2163680553
Party name: Biomedical Ethicists Ruth R. Faden, Ph.D. M.P.H., et al.
Kimberly A. Parker
    Counsel of Record
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale and Dorr LLP
1875 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20006

kimberly.parker@wilmerhale.com
202-663-6987
Party name: American College of Obstetricians and Gynecologists,et al.
Shannon Rose Selden
    Counsel of Record
Debevoise & Plimpton LLP
919 3rd Avenue
New York, NY 10022

srselden@debevoise.com
212-909-6000
Party name: American Public Health Association