No. 19-409 | |
Title: | City of Cleveland, Ohio, et al., Petitioners v. Ricky Jackson, et al. |
Docketed: | September 26, 2019 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit |
Case Numbers: | (17-3840, 17-3843) |
Decision Date: | May 20, 2019 |
Rehearing Denied: | June 27, 2019 |
Date | Proceedings and Orders |
Sep 25 2019 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 28, 2019) |
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Oct 07 2019 | Waiver of right of respondents Kwame Ajamu (fka Ronnie Bridgeman) & Wiley Bridgeman to respond filed. |
Main Document | |
Oct 17 2019 | Brief amicus curiae of International Municipal Lawyers Association filed. |
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Oct 22 2019 | Waiver of right of respondent Ricky Jackson to respond filed. |
Main Document | |
Oct 30 2019 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/15/2019. |
Nov 05 2019 | Response Requested. (Due December 5, 2019) |
Dec 05 2019 | Brief of respondents Ricky Jackson, et al. in opposition filed. |
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Dec 20 2019 | Reply of petitioners City of Cleveland, Ohio, et al. filed. |
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Dec 23 2019 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/10/2020. |
Jan 13 2020 | Petition DENIED. |
NAME | ADDRESS | PHONE |
Attorneys for Petitioners | ||
Jeffrey Alan Lamken Counsel of Record | Mololamken LLP The Watergate, Suite 660 600 New Hampshire Ave., N.W. Washington, DC 20037 jlamken@mololamken.com | 2025562010 |
Party name: City of Cleveland, Ohio, et al. | ||
Attorneys for Respondents | ||
Michael Kanovitz Counsel of Record | Loevy and Loevy 311 N. Aberdeen Street Third Floor Chicago, IL 60607 mike@loevy.com | 312-243-5900 |
Party name: Ricky Jackson | ||
David Eduard Mills Counsel of Record | The Mills Law Office LLC 1300 W. 9th St. #636 Cleveland, OH 44113 dm@MillsFederalAppeals.com | 2169294747 |
Party name: Kwame Ajamu (fka Ronnie Bridgeman) & Wiley Bridgeman | ||
Other | ||
Timothy Towery Coates Counsel of Record | Greines, Martin, Stein & Richland LLP 5900 Wilshire Boulevard, 12th Floor Los Angeles, CA 90036 tcoates@gmsr.com | (310) 859-7811 |
Party name: International Municipal Lawyers Association |