No. 19-404
Title:David Seth Worman, et al., Petitioners
v.
Maura T. Healey, Attorney General of Massachusetts, et al.
Docketed:September 25, 2019
Linked with 19A11
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the First Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-1545)
   Decision Date:April 26, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 28 2019Application (19A11) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from July 25, 2019 to September 23, 2019, submitted to Justice Breyer.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jun 30 2019Application (19A11) granted by Justice Breyer extending the time to file until September 23, 2019.
Sep 23 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 25, 2019)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 22 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from October 25, 2019 to December 9, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Oct 24 2019Brief amici curiae of Cato Institute, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 25 2019Brief amici curiae of National Association of Chiefs of Police et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 25 2019Brief amicus curiae of National African American Gun Association, Inc. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 25 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including December 9, 2019.
Oct 25 2019Amicus brief of Ninety-Four Members of the United States House of Representatives not accepted for filing. (October 28, 2019 - corrected brief to be submitted)
Oct 25 2019Brief amicus curiae of National Shooting Sports Foundation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 25 2019Brief amicus curiae of The National Rifle Association of America, Inc. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 25 2019Brief amici curiae of Ninety-Four Members of the United States House of Representatives filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word CountOther
Oct 25 2019Amicus brief of Commonwealth Second Amendment, Inc. not accepted for filing. (November 04, 2019)
Oct 30 2019Brief amicus curiae of Commonwealth Second Amendment, Inc. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
John Parker Sweeney
    Counsel of Record
Bradley Arant Boult Cummings, LLP
1615 L Street NW
Suite 1350
Washington, DC 20036

jsweeney@bradley.com
202-719-8216
Party name: David Seth Worman, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Julia Eleanor Kobick
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Massachusetts Attorney General
1 Ashburton Place
Boston, MA 02108

julia.kobick@mass.gov
617-963-2559
Party name: Maura T. Healey, et al.
Other
John Steven Foley
    Counsel of Record
Law Office of J. Steven Foley
11 Pleasant Street, Suite 100
Worcester, MA 01609

jsteven@attorneyfoley.com
508-754-1041
Party name: Commonwealth Second Amendment, Inc.
Joseph Gary Samuel Greenlee
    Counsel of Record
Firearms Policy Coalition
1215 K Street, 17th Floor
Sacramento, CA 95814

josephgreenlee@gmail.com
9704853303
Party name: Cato Institute, et al.
Stephen Porter Halbrook
    Counsel of Record
Stephen P. Halbrook, PH.D.Attorney at Law
3925 Chain Bridge Road
Suite 403
Fairfax, VA 22030

protell@aol.com
703-352-7276
Party name: National African American Gun Association, Inc.
Jonathan F. Mitchell
    Counsel of Record
Mitchell Law PLLC
111 Congress Avenue
Suite 400
Austin, TX 78701

jonathan@mitchell.law
(512) 686-3940
Party name: National Shooting Sports Foundation
Dan Mark Peterson
    Counsel of Record
Dan M. Peterson, PLLC
3925 Chain Bridge Road
Suite 403
Fairfax, VA 22030

dan@danpetersonlaw.com
7034253741
Party name: National Association of Chiefs of Police et al.
Eddie Travis Ramey
    Counsel of Record
Burr & Forman LLP
420 North 20th Street, Wells Fargo Tower, Suite 3400
Birmingham, AL 35203

tramey@burr.com
2054585489
Party name: Ninety-Four Members of the United States House of Representatives
Patrick Strawbridge
    Counsel of Record
Consovoy McCarthy PLLC
Ten Post Office Square
8th Floor South PMB #706
Boston, MA 02109

patrick@consovoymccarthy.com
2075223163
Party name: The National Rifle Association of America, Inc.