No. 19-386
Title:Monroe County Commission, Petitioner
v.
A.A. Nettles, Sr. Properties Limited, et al.
Docketed:September 23, 2019
Linked with 19A53
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Alabama
   Case Numbers:(1170738)
   Decision Date:April 26, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jul 12 2019Application (19A53) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from July 25, 2019 to September 23, 2019, submitted to Justice Thomas.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Jul 17 2019Application (19A53) granted by Justice Thomas extending the time to file until September 23, 2019.
Sep 23 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 23, 2019)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 01 2019Waiver of right of respondents A.A. Nettles, Sr. Properties Limited, et al. to respond filed.
Main Document
Oct 09 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/1/2019.
Oct 11 2019Response Requested. (Due November 12, 2019)
Oct 14 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from November 12, 2019 to December 12, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Oct 18 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including December 12, 2019.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Sarah Elaine Harrington
    Counsel of Record
Goldstein & Russell, P.C.
7475 Wisconsin Avenue
Suite 850
Bethesda, MD 20814

sharrington@goldsteinrussell.com
202-362-0636
Party name: Monroe County Commission
Attorneys for Respondents
John Douglas Lloyd
    Counsel of Record
The Law Office of J.D. Lloyd
2151 Highland Ave, S
Suite 310
Birmingham, AL 35205

jdlloyd@jdlloydlaw.com
2055383340
Party name: A.A. Nettles, Sr. Properties Limited, et al.