No. 19-376
Title:Dennis Thomas Thompson, Petitioner
v.
Andrew M. Saul, Commissioner of Social Security
Docketed:September 23, 2019
Linked with 19A160
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eighth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-2111)
   Decision Date:March 22, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:May 22, 2019
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Aug 09 2019Application (19A160) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from August 20, 2019 to October 4, 2019, submitted to Justice Gorsuch.
Aug 09 2019Pursuant to Rule 34.6 and Paragraph 9 of the Guidelines for the Submission of Documents to the Supreme Court's Electronic Filing System, filings in this case should be submitted in paper form only, and should not be submitted through the Court's electronic filng system.
Aug 12 2019Application (19A160) granted by Justice Gorsuch extending the time to file until September 19, 2019.
Sep 19 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 23, 2019)
Oct 16 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from October 23, 2019 to November 22, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Oct 17 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including November 22, 2019.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Jeffrey Paul JustmanFaegre Baker Daniels
2200 Wells Fargo Center, 90 South Seventh Street
Minneapolis, MN 55402

jeff.justman@faegrebd.com
6127667133
Party name: Dennis Thompson
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Saul, Andre