No. 19-373
Title:James Walker, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:September 19, 2019
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-5782, 17-5783)
   Decision Date:April 16, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:July 23, 2019
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Sep 19 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 21, 2019)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 21 2019Brief of respondent United States of America filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word Count
Oct 22 2019Waiver of the 14-day waiting period under Rule 15.5 filed.
Main Document
Oct 23 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/8/2019.
Nov 12 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/15/2019.
Nov 15 2019Petition GRANTED.
Nov 19 2019Motion for an extension of time to file the briefs on the merits filed.
Main Document
Dec 05 2019Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, James Walker
Blanket Consent
Dec 05 2019Motion to dispense with printing the joint appendix filed by petitioner James Walker.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Dec 05 2019Motion to extend the time to file the briefs on the merits granted. The time to file the joint appendix and petitioner's brief on the merits is extended to and including January 6, 2020. The time to file respondent's brief on the merits is extended to and including February 12, 2020.
Dec 16 2019Motion to dispense with printing the joint appendix filed by petitioner GRANTED.
Jan 06 2020Brief of petitioner James Walker filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 13 2020Brief amicus curiae of FAMM filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 13 2020Brief amicus curiae of The National Association of Federal Defenders filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 13 2020Brief amicus curiae of Americans for Prosperity Foundation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 13 2020Brief amicus curiae of National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 13 2020Motion of The National Association of Federal Defenders for leave to file amicus brief not accepted for filing. (January 15, 2020 -- corrected version submitted)
Jan 13 2020Brief amici curiae of American Immigration Council, et al., filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 13 2020Brief amici curiae of Law Professors filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 13 2020Amicus brief of National Association for Public Defense submitted.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Kannon K. Shanmugam
    Counsel of Record
Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison LLP
2001 K Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20006

kshanmugam@paulweiss.com
(202) 223-7300
Party name: James Walker
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States of America
Other
David A. Barrett
    Counsel of Record
Boies Schiller Flexner LLP
55 Hudson Yards
New York, NY 10001

dbarrett@bsfllp.com
212-446-2300
Party name: The National Association of Federal Defenders
Douglas A. Berman
    Counsel of Record
The Ohio State University Moritz College of Law
55 West 12th Avenue
Columbus, OH 43210

berman.43@osu.edu
6146888690
Party name: Law Professors
Ishan Kharshedji Bhabha
    Counsel of Record
Jenner and Block LLP
1099 New York Ave NW, Suite 900
Washington, DC 20001

IBhabha@jenner.com
202-637-6327
Party name: National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers
David John Debold
    Counsel of Record
Gibson Dunn & Crutcher LLP
1050 Connecticut Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20036

ddebold@gibsondunn.com
2029558551
Party name: FAMM
Daniel Tyler Hansmeier
    Counsel of Record
500 State Avenue
Suite 201
Kansas City, KS 66101

daniel_hansmeier@fd.org
913-551-6712
Party name: National Association for Public Defense
Rex S. Heinke
    Counsel of Record
Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld, LLP
1999 Avenue of the Stars, Suite 600
Los Angeles, CA 90067

rheinke@akingump.com
3102291030
Party name: American Immigration Council, et al.,
Ryan Patrick Mulvey
    Counsel of Record
Americans for Prosperity Foundation
1310 North Courthouse Road
Suite 700
Arlington, VA 22201

rmulvey@afphq.org
(571) 444-2841
Party name: Americans for Prosperity Foundation