No. 19-368
Title:Ford Motor Company, Petitioner
v.
Montana Eighth Judicial District Court, et al.
Docketed:September 19, 2019
Linked with 19A103
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Montana
   Case Numbers:(OP 19-0099)
   Decision Date:May 21, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jul 24 2019Application (19A103) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from August 19, 2019 to September 18, 2019, submitted to Justice Kagan.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Jul 25 2019Application (19A103) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until September 18, 2019.
Sep 18 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 21, 2019)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 26 2019Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Ford Motor Company.
Blanket Consent
Oct 01 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from October 21, 2019 to November 20, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Oct 04 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including November 20, 2019.
Oct 21 2019Brief amici curiae of The Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 21 2019Brief amicus curiae of The Alliance of Automobile Manufacturers filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 20 2019Brief of respondent Charles Lucero, personal representative of the Estate of Markkaya Jean Gullett in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 04 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/10/2020.
Dec 04 2019Reply of petitioner Ford Motor Company filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 13 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/17/2020.
Jan 17 2020Petition GRANTED. The petition for a writ of certiorari in No. 19-369 is granted. The cases are consolidated, and a total of one hour is allotted for oral argument. VIDED.
Jan 17 2020Because the Court has consolidated these cases for briefing and oral argument, future filings and activity in the cases will now be reflected on the docket of No. 19-368. Subsequent filings in these cases must therefore be submitted through the electronic filing system in No. 19-368. Each document submitted in connection with one or more of these cases must include on its cover the case number and caption for each case in which the filing is intended to be submitted. Where a filing is submitted in fewer than all of the cases, the docket entry will reflect the case number(s) in which the filing is submitted; a document filed in all of the consolidated cases will be noted as “VIDED.”
Jan 27 2020Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Ford Motor Company.VIDED.
Blanket Consent
Feb 21 2020SET FOR ARGUMENT on Monday, April 27, 2020. VIDED.
Feb 26 2020Record requested from the Supreme Court of Montana.
Feb 28 2020Joint appendix filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Feb 28 2020Brief of petitioner Ford Motor Company filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 04 2020The record from the Supreme Court of Montana is available on the Montana Supreme Court's web site www.supremecourtdocket.mt.gov.
Mar 05 2020Brief amicus curiae of Product Liability Advisory Council, Inc. filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 06 2020Brief amicus curiae of Washington Legal Foundation filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 06 2020Brief amicus curiae of United States filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Mar 06 2020Brief amici curiae of The Alliance for Automobile Innovation, et al. filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 06 2020Brief amici curiae of The Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, et al. filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 06 2020Brief amici curiae of Pharmaceutical Research and Manufacturers of America (PhRMA) filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 06 2020Brief amicus curiae of Institute of International Bankers filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 06 2020Brief amicus curiae of DRI - The Voice Of The Defense Bar filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 19 2020CIRCULATED
Mar 30 2020Brief of Charles Lucero, personal representative of the Estate of Markkaya Jean Gullett submitted.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 30 2020Motion of United States for leave to participate in oral argument and for divided argument submitted.
Proof of ServiceMain Document

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Sean Marotta
    Counsel of Record
Hogan Lovells US LLP
555 Thirteenth Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20004

sean.marotta@hoganlovells.com
2026374881
Party name: Ford Motor Company
Attorneys for Respondents
Deepak Gupta
    Counsel of Record
Gupta Wessler PLLC
1900 L Street, NW
Suite 312
Washington, DC 20036

deepak@guptawessler.com
(202) 888-1741
Party name: Charles Lucero, personal representative of the Estate of Markkaya Jean Gullett
Other
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Lisa Marie Baird
    Counsel of Record
Reed Smith LLP
1001 Brickell Bay Drive
9th Floor
Miami, FL 33131

lbaird@reedsmith.com
786.747.0220
Party name: DRI - The Voice Of The Defense Bar
David R. Geiger
    Counsel of Record
Foley Hoag LLP
Seaport West
155 Seaport Boulevard
Boston, MA 02210-2600

dgeiger@foleyhoag.com
6178321124
Party name: Product Liability Advisory Council, Inc.
Elbert Lin
    Counsel of Record
Hunton Andrews Kurth LLP
951 E. Byrd Street
Riverfront Plaza, East Tower
Richmond, VA 23219-4074

elin@HuntonAK.com
804-788-7202
Party name: Institute of International Bankers
Andrew John Pincus
    Counsel of Record
Mayer Brown LLP
1999 K Street, NW
Washington, DC 20006

apincus@mayerbrown.com
202-263-3220
Party name: The Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, The National Association of Manufacturers, and The American Tort Reform Association
Amanda Kelly Rice
    Counsel of Record
Jones Day
150 W. Jefferson Ave., Suite 2100
Detroit, MI 48226

arice@jonesday.com
313-230-7926
Party name: Washington Legal Foundation
Jaime Ann Santos
    Counsel of Record
Goodwin Procter LLP
1900 N Street, NW
Washington, DC 20036

jsantos@goodwinlaw.com
2023464034
Party name: The Alliance of Automobile Manufacturers
Virginia Anne Seitz
    Counsel of Record
Sidley Austin LLP
1501 K Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20005

vseitz@sidley.com
202-736-8000
Party name: Pharmaceutical Research and Manufacturers of America (PhRMA)