No. 19-361
Title:Renado Smith and Richard Delancy, Petitioners
v.
United States
Docketed:September 18, 2019
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-13265 , 17-13330)
   Decision Date:July 2, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Sep 18 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 18, 2019)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 09 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from October 18, 2019 to November 18, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Oct 10 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including November 18, 2019.
Oct 10 2019Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Renado Smith, et al.
Blanket Consent
Oct 18 2019Brief amici curiae of Criminal Defense Organizations filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 18 2019Brief amicus curiae of The Constitution Project at the Project On Government Oversight filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 18 2019Brief amicus curiae of Florida Association for Criminal Defense Lawyers filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of ServiceOtherOther
Oct 28 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from November 18, 2019 to December 9, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Oct 29 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including December 9, 2019.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Neal Kumar Katyal
    Counsel of Record
Hogan Lovells US LLP
555 Thirteenth St., N.W.
Washington, DC 20004

neal.katyal@hoganlovells.com
202 637 5528
Party name: Renado Smith, et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States of America
Other
Thomas C. Goldstein
    Counsel of Record
Goldstein & Russell, P.C.
7475 Wisconsin Ave.
Suite 850
Bethesda, MD 20814

tgoldstein@goldsteinrussell.com
(202) 362-0636
Party name: Criminal Defense Organizations
Kevin Brian Muhlendorf
    Counsel of Record
Wiley Rein, LLP
1776 K Street, NW
Washington, DC 20006

kmuhlendorf@wileyrein.com
202-719-7052
Party name: The Constitution Project at the Project On Government Oversight
Michael Robert Ufferman
    Counsel of Record
Michael Ufferman Law Firm, P.A.
2022-1 Raymond Diehl Road
Tallahassee, FL 32308

ufferman@uffermanlaw.com
8503862345
Party name: Florida Association for Criminal Defense Lawyers