No. 19-357
Title:City of Chicago, Illinois, Petitioner
v.
Robbin L. Fulton, et al.
Docketed:September 18, 2019
Linked with 19A1029
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Seventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-2527, 18-2793, 18-2835, 18-3023)
   Decision Date:June 19, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Sep 17 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 18, 2019)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 02 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from October 18, 2019 to November 18, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Oct 03 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including November 18, 2019.
Oct 17 2019Brief amicus curiae of International Municipal Lawyers' Association filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 08 2019Brief of respondents Robbin L. Fulton, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 25 2019Reply of petitioner City of Chicago filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 26 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/13/2019.
Dec 18 2019Petition GRANTED.
Feb 03 2020Joint appendix filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Feb 03 2020Brief of petitioner City of Chicago filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 07 2020Brief amici curiae of Professors Ralph Brubaker, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 10 2020Brief amicus curiae of United States filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Feb 10 2020Brief amici curiae of National Association of Counties, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 21 2020SET FOR ARGUMENT on Monday, April 20, 2020.
Feb 26 2020Record requested from the U.S.C.A. 7th Circuit.
Feb 26 2020Motion of the Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument filed.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Feb 27 2020The record from the U.S.C.A. 7th Circuit is available on PACER; sealed portions are electronically available with the Clerk.
Mar 04 2020Brief of respondents Robbin L. Fulton, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 10 2020Brief amici curiae of Bankruptcy Law Professors filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 10 2020Brief amicus curiae of National Association of Chapter Thirteen Trustees filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 10 2020Brief amicus curiae of Geraci Law LLC filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 11 2020Brief amici curiae of National Consumer Bankruptcy Rights Center, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 11 2020Brief amicus curiae of National Association of Bankruptcy Trustees filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 11 2020Brief amici curiae of Professors John A. E. Pottow and Jay Lawrence Westbrook filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 11 2020Amicus brief of American Civil Liberties Union, American Civil Liberties Union of Illinois, Cato Institute, Fines and Fees Justice Center, Institute for Justice, R Street Institute, Rutherford Institute not accepted for filing. (March 19, 2020 - Corrected version submitted).
Mar 11 2020Amicus brief of American Civil Liberties Union, American Civil Liberties Union of Illinois, Cato Institute, Fines and Fees Justice Center, Institute for Justice, R Street Institute, Rutherford Institute not accepted for filing (Duplicate; corrected version submitted).
Mar 11 2020Brief amici curiae of American Civil Liberties Union, et al. filed. (March 18, 2020)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountCertificate of Word Count
Mar 19 2020CIRCULATED
Mar 23 2020Motion of the Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument GRANTED.
Mar 31 2020Application (19A1029) of petitioner to extend the time to file a reply brief on the merits from April 3, 2020 to April 8, 2020, submitted to Justice Kavanaugh.
Main Document
Apr 01 2020Application (19A1029) of petitioner granted by Justice Kavanaugh extending the time to file a reply brief on the merits until April 8, 2020.
Apr 03 2020ORAL ARGUMENT POSTPONED.
Apr 08 2020Reply of petitioner City of Chicago filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 13 2020Argument to be rescheduled for the October Term 2020.
Jul 13 2020SET FOR ARGUMENT on Tuesday, October 13, 2020.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Craig Goldblatt
    Counsel of Record
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale and Dorr LLP
1875 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20006

craig.goldblatt@wilmerhale.com
202-663-6000
Party name: City of Chicago
Attorneys for Respondents
Eugene R. Wedoff
    Counsel of Record
144 N. Elmwood Avenue
Oak Park, IL 60302

erwedoff@me.com
312-285-5849
Party name: Robbin L. Fulton, George Peake, and Timothy Shannon
Other
Jeffrey B. Wall
    Counsel of Record
Acting Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
George Eric Brunstad Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Dechert LLP
90 State House Square
Hartford, CT 06013

Eric.Brunstad@dechert.com
8605243999
Party name: Consumer Bankruptcy Rights Center, National Association Of Consumer Bankruptcy Attorneys, And Legal Aid Chicago
Nusrat Jahan Choudhury
    Counsel of Record
Roger Baldwin Foundation of the ACLU of Illinois
150 North Michigan Avenue
Suite 600
Chicago, IL 60601

nchoudhury@aclu-il.org
312-201-9740
Party name: American Civil Liberties Union, American Civil Liberties Union of Illinois, Cato Institute, Fines and Fees Justice Center, Institute for Justice, R Street Institute, Rutherford Institute
Michael Lewis Cook
    Counsel of Record
Schulte Roth & Zabel LLP
919 Third Avenue
New York, NY 10022

Michael.Cook@srz.com
212.756.2150
Party name: Professors Ralph Brubaker, et al.
Nathan Edward Curtis
    Counsel of Record
Geraci Law L.L.C.
55 E. Monroe Street Suite #3400
Chicago, IL 60603

nat@geracilaw.com
312-499-6201
Party name: Geraci Law LLC
Henry Edward Hildebrand III
    Counsel of Record
P.O. Box 340019
Nashville, TN 37203-0019

hank@ch13bna.com
615-244-1101
Party name: National Association of Chapter Thirteen Trustees
David R. Kuney
    Counsel of Record
9200 Cambridge Manor Court
Potomac, MD 20854

davidkuney@dkuney.com
301-299-9544
Party name: Bankruptcy Law Professors
John Anthony Edwards Pottow
    Counsel of Record
University of Michigan Law School
625 S. State Street
Ann Arbor, MI 48109

pottow@umich.edu
7346473736
Party name: Professors John A. E. Pottow and Jay Lawrence Westbrook
Scott Burnett Smith
    Counsel of Record
Bradley Arant Boult Cummings, LLP
200 Clinton Avenue West, Suite 900
Huntsville, AL 35801

ssmith@bradley.com
256-517-5100
Party name: Nadtional Association of Counties, et al.
Dean Alan Ziehl
    Counsel of Record
Pachulski Stang Ziehl & Jones LLP
10100 Santa Monica Blvd., 13th Floor
Los Angeles, CA 90067

dziehl@pszjlaw.com
3102776910
Party name: National Association of Bankruptcy Trustees