No. 19-351
Vide 19-520
Title:Federal Republic of Germany, et al., Petitioners
v.
Alan Philipp, et al.
Docketed:September 18, 2019
Linked with 19A118
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the District of Columbia Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-7064, 17-7117)
   Decision Date:July 10, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:June 18, 2019
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jul 26 2019Application (19A118) for a stay pending the filing and disposition of a petition for a writ of certiorari, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Main Document
Jul 30 2019Application (19A118) denied by The Chief Justice. The application is denied without prejudice to petitioners filing a new application after seeking relief in the district court.
Sep 16 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 18, 2019)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 17 2019Brief of respondents Alan Philipp, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentOtherCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 27 2019Reply of petitioners Federal Republic of Germany, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Dec 30 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/17/2020.
Jan 21 2020The Solicitor General is invited to file a brief in this case expressing the views of the United States.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Jonathan M. Freiman
    Counsel of Record
Wiggin & Dana LLP
One Century Tower
P.O. Box 1832
New Haven, CT 06508-1832

jfreiman@wiggin.com
203-498-4584
Party name: Federal Republic of Germany, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Nicholas Michael O'Donnell
    Counsel of Record
Sullivan & Worcester LLP
One Post Office Square
Boston, MA 02109

nodonnell@sullivanlaw.com
617-338-2814
Party name: Alan Philipp, et al.