No. 19-348
Title:St. James School, Petitioner
v.
Darryl Biel, as Personal Representative of the Estate of Kristen Biel
Docketed:September 17, 2019
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-55180)
   Decision Date:December 17, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:June 25, 2019
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Sep 16 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 17, 2019)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 27 2019Brief amici curiae of Church of God in Christ, Inc. and Union of Orthodox Jewish Congregations of America filed. VIDED
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 11 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from October 17, 2019 to November 13, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Oct 16 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including November 13, 2019.
Oct 16 2019Brief amici curiae of Professors Douglas Laycock, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 17 2019Brief amici curiae of General Conference of Seventh-day Adventists, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 17 2019Brief amicus curiae of Asma T. Uddin filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 17 2019Brief amicus curiae of Stephen Wise Temple filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 13 2019Brief of respondent Darryl Biel in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 21 2019Waiver of 14-day waiting period for the distribution of the petition under Rule 15.5 filed.
Main Document
Nov 22 2019Reply of petitioner St. James School filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 26 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/13/2019.
Dec 18 2019Petition GRANTED. The petition for a writ of certiorari in No. 19-267 is granted. The cases are consolidated, and a total of one hour is allotted for oral argument. VIDED.
Dec 18 2019Because the Court has consolidated these cases for briefing and oral argument, future filings and activity in the cases will now be reflected on the docket of No. 19-267. Subsequent filings in these cases must therefore be submitted through the electronic filing system in No. 19-267. Each document submitted in connection with one or more of these cases must include on its cover the case number and caption for each case in which the filing is intended to be submitted. Where a filing is submitted in fewer than all of the cases, the docket entry will reflect the case number(s) in which the filing is submitted; a document filed in all of the consolidated cases will be noted as “VIDED.”
Jan 31 2020SET FOR ARGUMENT on Wednesday, April 1, 2020. VIDED
Feb 19 2020CIRCULATED
Feb 19 2020Record requested from the U.S.C.A. 9th Circuit.
Mar 04 2020The record from the U.S.C.A. 9th Circuit is electronic and located on Pacer.
Mar 16 2020ORAL ARGUMENT POSTPONED. VIDED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Eric Christopher Rassbach
    Counsel of Record
The Becket Fund for Religious Liberty
1200 New Hampshire Avenue, NW
Suite 700
Washington, DC 20036

erassbach@becketlaw.org
2029550095
Party name: St. James School
Attorneys for Respondent
Jennifer Anne Lipski
    Counsel of Record
JML Law, A Professional Law Corporation
5855 Topanga Canyon Boulevard, Suite 300
Woodland Hills, CA 91367

jennifer@jmllaw.com
818-610-8800
Party name: Darryl Biel
Other
Toby Jay Heytens
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General
202 North Ninth Street
Richmond, VA 23219

SolicitorGeneral@oag.state.va.us
(804) 786-7240
Party name: Virginia, et al.
Paul D. Clement
    Counsel of Record
Kirkland & Ellis LLP
1301 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20004

paul.clement@kirkland.com
2023895000
Party name: Stephen Wise Temple
Victoria Dorfman
    Counsel of Record
Jones Day
51 Louisiana Ave. NW
Washington, DC 20001

vdorfman@jonesday.com
(202) 879-3939
Party name: Professors Douglas Laycock, et al.
Thomas Henderson Dupree Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher, LLP
1050 Connecticut Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20036

tdupree@gibsondunn.com
202-955-8500
Party name: Church of God in Christ, Inc. and Union of Orthodox Jewish Congregations of America
Daniel Patrick Kearney Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale & Dorr LLP
1875 Pennsylvania Avenue NW
Washington, DC 20006

Daniel.Kearney@wilmerhale.com
202-663-6000
Party name: Asma T. Uddin
Eric D. McArthur
    Counsel of Record
Sidley Austin LLP
1501 K Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20005

emcarthur@sidley.com
(202) 736-8018
Party name: General Conference of Seventh-day Adventists and Jewish Coalition for Religious Liberty
Jesse Michael Panuccio
    Counsel of Record
Boies Schiller Flexner LLP
1401 New York Ave, NW
Washington, DC 20005

jpanuccio@bsfllp.com
202 237 2727
Party name: Senator Mike Lee, et al.
Zachary Guy Parks
    Counsel of Record
Covington & Burling LLP
850 Tenth St. NW
Washington, DC 20001

zparks@cov.com
2022850524
Party name: Professor John D. Inazu
James A. Sonne
    Counsel of Record
Religious Liberty Clinic, Stanford Law School
559 Nathan Abbott Way
Stanford, CA 94305-8610

jsonne@law.stanford.edu
(650) 723-1422
Party name: National Catholic Educational Association
Misha Tseytlin
    Counsel of Record
Troutman Sanders LLP
One North Wacker Drive
Suite 2905
Chicago, IL 60606

misha.tseytlin@troutman.com
312-759-5947
Party name: The Association of Classical Christian Schools, et al.,
Heather Lynn Weaver
    Counsel of Record
Americans United for Separation of Church and Stat
518 C Street, NE
Washington, DC 20002

hweaver@aclu.org
202-675-2330
Party name: The American Civil Liberties Union et al