No. 19-347
Title:AER Advisors, Inc., et al., Petitioners
v.
Fidelity Brokerage Services, LLC
Docketed:September 17, 2019
Linked with 19A35
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the First Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-1884)
   Decision Date:April 17, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jul 03 2019Application (19A35) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from July 16, 2019 to September 13, 2019, submitted to Justice Breyer.
Main Document
Jul 08 2019Application (19A35) granted by Justice Breyer extending the time to file until September 13, 2019.
Sep 13 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 17, 2019)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 30 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/15/2019.
Nov 06 2019Response Requested. (Due December 6, 2019)

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Howard Graff
    Counsel of Record
Arent Fox LLP
1301 Avenue of the Americas
Floor 42
New York, NY 10019

howard.graff@arentfox.com
212-484-3952
Party name: AER Advisors Inc., et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Christopher R. J. Pace
    Counsel of Record
Jones Day
Brickell World Plaza
600 Brickell Avenue, Suite 3300
Miami, FL 33131

crjpace@jonesday.com
305.714.9730
Party name: Fidelity Brokerage Services, LLC