No. 19-345
Title:Dorian Johnson, Petitioner
v.
City of Ferguson, Missouri, et al.
Docketed:September 17, 2019
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eighth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(16-1697)
   Decision Date:June 17, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Sep 16 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 17, 2019)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 17 2019Brief of respondents City of Ferguson Missouri, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 05 2019Reply of petitioner Dorian Johnson filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 06 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/22/2019.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Tillman J. Breckenridge
    Counsel of Record
Pierce Bainbridge Beck Price & Hecht LLP
601 Pennsylvania Ave., NW, Suite 700S
Washington, DC 20004

tjb@piercebainbridge.com
202-759-6925
Party name: Dorian Johnson
Attorneys for Respondents
Robert Thomas Plunkert
    Counsel of Record
Pitzer, Snodgrass, P.C.
100 South Fourth Street, Suite 400
St. Louis, MO 63102

plunkert@pspclaw.com
314-335-1306
Party name: City of Ferguson Missouri, et al.