No. 19-343
Title:New York Republican State Committee, Petitioner
v.
Securities and Exchange Commission
Docketed:September 17, 2019
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the District of Columbia Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-1111)
   Decision Date:June 18, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Sep 16 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 17, 2019)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 08 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from October 17, 2019 to November 18, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Oct 09 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including November 18, 2019.
Nov 08 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from November 18, 2019 to December 6, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Nov 12 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including December 6, 2019.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Jason Brett Torchinsky
    Counsel of Record
Holtzman Vogel Josefiak Torchinsky PLLC
45 North Hill Dr., Suite 100
Warrenton, VA 20186

jt@hvjt.law
540 341 8808
Party name: New York Republican State Committee
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Securities and Exchange Commission