No. 19-337
Title:Regents of the University of Minnesota, Petitioner
v.
LSI Corporation, et al.
Docketed:September 12, 2019
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
   Case Numbers:(2018-1559, 2018-1560, 2018-1561, 2018-1562, 2018-1563, 2018-1564, 2018-1565)
   Decision Date:June 14, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Sep 12 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 15, 2019)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 17 2019Motion of respondent Gilead Sciences, Inc. to extend the time to file a response from October 15, 2019 to November 14, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Sep 19 2019Motion of respondents Ericsson Inc., et al. to extend the time to file a response from October 15, 2019 to November 14, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Sep 20 2019The motions to extend the time to file responses to the petition for a writ of certiorari are granted and the time is extended to and including November 14, 2019, for all respondents.
Oct 04 2019Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Regents of the University of Minnesota.
Blanket Consent
Oct 11 2019Brief amicus curiae of Association of Public and Land-grant Universities filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 15 2019Brief amici curiae of State of Indiana et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 15 2019Brief amici curiae of Twelve State Universities and State University Systems filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 24 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from November 14, 2019 to December 5, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Oct 25 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including December 5, 2019, for all respondents.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Kevin K. Russell
    Counsel of Record
Goldstein and Russell, P.C.
7475 Wisconsin Avenue
Suite 850
Bethesda, MD 20814

krussell@goldsteinrussell.com
(202) 362-0636
Party name: Regents of the University of Minnesota
Attorneys for Respondents
Mark Simon Davies
    Counsel of Record
Orrick, Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP
Columbia Center
1152 15th Street NW
Washington, DC 20005

mark.davies@orrick.com
202-339-8631
Party name: Ericsson Inc. and Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson
Adam Karl Mortara
    Counsel of Record
Bartlit Beck LLP
54 W. Hubbard Street
Chicago, IL 60654

adam.mortara@bartlit-beck.com
7737507154
Party name: Gilead Sciences, Inc.
Kristopher Lane Reed
    Counsel of Record
Kilpatrick Townsend & Stockton LLP
1400 Wewatta St., Ste. 600
Denver, CO 80202

kreed@kilpatricktownsend.com
3035714000
Party name: LSI Corporation and Avago Technologies U.S. Inc.
Other
Thomas M. Fisher
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Indiana Attorney General
Indiana Government Center South, Fifth Floor
302 West Washington Street
Indianapolis, IN 46204

tom.fisher@atg.in.gov
317-232-6255
Party name: State of Indiana et al.
Joshua Stephen Johnson
    Counsel of Record
Vinson & Elkins LLP
2200 Pennsylvania Ave. NW
Suite 500 West
Washington, DC 20037

joshjohnson@velaw.com
2026396500
Party name: Association of Public and Land-grant Universities
Michael W. Shore
    Counsel of Record
Shore Chan DePumpo LLP
901 Main Street
Suite 3300
Dallas, TX 75202

mshore@shorechan.com
214-593-9110
Party name: Twelve State Universities and State University Systems