No. 19-333
Title:Arlene's Flowers, Inc., dba Arlene's Flowers and Gifts, et al., Petitioners
v.
Washington, et al.
Docketed:September 12, 2019
Linked with 19A229
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Washington
   Case Numbers:(91615-2)
   Decision Date:June 6, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Aug 23 2019Application (19A229) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from September 4, 2019 to September 11, 2019, submitted to Justice Kagan.
Main Document
Aug 28 2019Application (19A229) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until September 11, 2019.
Sep 11 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 15, 2019)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 24 2019Blanket Consent filed by Petitioners, Arlene's Flowers, Inc., et al.
Blanket Consent
Oct 07 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from October 15, 2019 to December 6, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Oct 11 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including December 6, 2019.
Oct 11 2019Brief amicus curiae of Foundation for Moral Law filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 14 2019Brief amici curiae of Samaritan's Purse and the Billy Graham Evangelistic Association filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 14 2019Brief amici curiae of The Cato Institute, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 14 2019Brief amici curiae of Concerned Women for America, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 15 2019Amicus brief of The Ethics and Religious Liberty Commission of the Southern Baptist Convention, et al. not accepted for filing. (October 17, 2019) (Corrected copy submitted)
Oct 15 2019Brief amici curiae of The Ethics and Religious Liberty Commission of the Southern Baptist Convention, et al. filed. (10/17/2019)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 15 2019Brief amicus curiae of Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 15 2019Brief amici curiae of The States of Arkansas, Texas, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 15 2019Brief amicus curiae of Center for Religious Expression filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 15 2019Brief amici curiae of United States Senators and Representatives filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 15 2019Brief amici curiae of First Amendment Scholars filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Kristen Kellie Waggoner
    Counsel of Record
Alliance Defending Freedom
15100 N. 90th St.
Scottsdale, AZ 85260

kwaggoner@adflegal.org
480-444-0020
Party name: Arlene's Flowers, Inc., et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Noah Guzzo Purcell
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General
1125 Washington Street, SE
P.O. Box 40100
Olympia, WA 98504-0100

noahp@atg.wa.gov
360-753-2536
Party name: State of Washington, et al.
Other
Nicholas Jacob Bronni
    Counsel of Record
Arkansas Solicitor General
Arkansas Attorney General's Office
323 Center St., Suite 200
Little Rock, AR 72201

nicholas.bronni@arkansasag.gov
(501) 682-6302
Party name: The States of Arkansas, Texas, et al.
Anthony Thomas Caso
    Counsel of Record
Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence
One University Drive
Orange, CA 92866

caso@chapman.edu
877-855-3330
Party name: Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence
Matthew James Clark
    Counsel of Record
Foundation for Moral Law
1 Dexter Avenue
Montgomery, AL 36104

matt@morallaw.org
334-262-1245
Party name: Foundation for Moral Law
Frederick W. Claybrook Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Claybrook, LLC
700 Sixth St., NW, Ste.430
Washington, DC 20001

rick@claybrooklaw.com
202-250-3883
Party name: Concerned Women for America, et al.
John Michael Connolly
    Counsel of Record
Consovoy McCarthy PLLC
1600 Wilson Blvd
Suite 700
Arlington, VA 22209

mike@consovoymccarthy.com
703-243-9423
Party name: UNITED STATES SENATORS AND REPRESENTATIVES
Nathan W. Kellum
    Counsel of Record
Center for Religious Expression
699 Oakleaf Office Lane
Suite 107
Memphis, TN 38117

nkellum@crelaw.org
9016845485
Party name: Center for Religious Expression
John Guyton Knepper Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Law Office of John G. Knepper, LLC
2122 Warren Avenue, Suite 310
Cheyenne, WY 82001

John@KnepperLLC.com
307-632-2842
Party name: Samaritan's Purse and the Billy Graham Evangelistic Association
Ilya Shapiro
    Counsel of Record
Cato Institute
1000 Massachusetts Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20001

ishapiro@cato.org
2028420200
Party name: The Cato Institute
David H. Thompson
    Counsel of Record
Cooper & Kirk, PLLC
1523 New Hampshire Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC 20036

dthompson@cooperkirk.com
202-220-9600
Party name: The Ethics and Religious Liberty Commission of the Southern Baptist Convention, The Islam and Religious Freedom Action Team of the Religious Freedom Institute, and The Jewish Coalition for Religious Liberty
Randall L. Wenger
    Counsel of Record
Independence Law Center
23 N. Front Street, First Floor
Harrisburg, PA 17101

rwenger@indlawcenter.org
717-657-4990
Party name: First Amendment Scholars