No. 19-331
Title:Sequoia Capital Operations, LLC, Petitioner
v.
Jessica Gingras, et al.
Docketed:September 11, 2019
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit
   Case Numbers:(16-2019, 16-2132, 16-2135, 16-2138, 16-2140)
   Decision Date:April 24, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:June 13, 2019
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Sep 11 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 11, 2019)
PetitionProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Oct 01 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from October 11, 2019 to November 26, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Oct 04 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including November 26, 2019.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Todd Raymond Geremia
    Counsel of Record
Jones Day
250 Vesey Street
New York, NY 10281

trgeremia@jonesday.com
(212) 326-3939
Party name: SEQUOIA CAPITAL OPERATIONS, LLC; TCV V, L.P.
Attorneys for Respondents
Matthew B. Byrne
    Counsel of Record
Gravel & Shea PC
76 St. Paul Street
P.O. Box 369
Burlington, VT 05402

mbyrne@gravelshea.com
8026580220
Party name: JESSICA GINGRAS, ON BEHALF OF HERSELF AND OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED; ANGELA C. GIVEN, ON BEHALF OF HERSELF AND OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED