No. 19-312
Title:Ali Ekhlassi, Petitioner
v.
National Lloyds Insurance Company
Docketed:September 6, 2019
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-20228)
   Decision Date:June 4, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Sep 03 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 7, 2019)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 04 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from October 7, 2019 to December 2, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Oct 07 2019Brief amici curiae of The National Association of Public Insurance Adjusters and The Texas Association of Public Insurance Adjusters filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 08 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including December 2, 2019.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Daniel L. Geyser
    Counsel of Record
Geyser P.C.
One Energy Square
4925 Greenville Ave., Ste. 200
Dallas, TX 75206

daniel.geyser@geyserpc.com
214-800-2660
Party name: Ali Ekhlassi
Attorneys for Respondent
Scot Graves Doyen
    Counsel of Record
Doyen Sebesta Ltd., LLP
450 Gears Rd, Ste 350
Houston, TX 77067

sdoyen@ds-lawyers.com
7135424568
Party name: National Lloyds Insurance Company
Other
Erin Glenn Busby
    Counsel of Record
University of Texas School of Law Supreme Court Clinic
727 East Dean Keeton Street
Austin, TX 78705

egbusby@swbell.net
7139660409
Party name: The National Association of Public Insurance Adjusters and The Texas Association of Public Insurance Adjusters