No. 19-311
Title:Al Cannon, Sheriff, Charleston County, South Carolina, Petitioner
v.
Broderick William Seay, Jr.
Docketed:September 6, 2019
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-7242)
   Decision Date:June 21, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:July 19, 2019
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Sep 03 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 7, 2019)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 03 2019Waiver of right of respondent Broderick Seay to respond filed.
Main Document
Oct 09 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/1/2019.
Oct 15 2019Response Requested. (Due November 14, 2019)
Nov 14 2019Brief of respondent Broderick Seay in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Nov 14 2019Motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed by respondent Broderick Seay.
Main DocumentOtherProof of Service
Nov 26 2019Reply of petitioner Al Cannon filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 04 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/10/2020.
Jan 13 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/17/2020.
Jan 21 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/24/2020.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Melody Jane Brown
    Counsel of Record
South Carolina Attorney General's Office
Post Office Box 11549
Columbia, SC 29211

mbrown@scag.gov
803-734-3742
Party name: Al Cannon
Attorneys for Respondent
Jason Scott Luck
    Counsel of Record
Garrett Law Offices
1075 East Montague Avenue
Charleston, SC 29405

jluck@garrettlawsc.com
843.554.5515
Party name: Broderick Seay