No. 19-309
Title:John C. Carney, Governor of Delaware, Petitioner
v.
James R. Adams
Docketed:September 6, 2019
Linked with 19A57
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Third Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-1045)
   Decision Date:April 10, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:May 7, 2019
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jul 11 2019Application (19A57) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from August 5, 2019 to October 4, 2019, submitted to Justice Alito.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jul 16 2019Application (19A57) granted by Justice Alito extending the time to file until September 4, 2019.
Sep 04 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 7, 2019)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 06 2019Supplement to list of directly related proceedings by petitioner filed.
Main Document
Sep 23 2019Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Governor of Delaware.
Blanket Consent
Oct 02 2019Brief amici curiae of Professors filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 07 2019Brief amicus curiae of Joel Edan Friedlander filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 07 2019Brief amici curiae of Former Chief Justices of the Delaware Supreme Court filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 07 2019Brief amici curiae of Former Governors of the State of Delaware filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 07 2019Brief of respondent James R. Adams in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 22 2019Reply of petitioner John C. Carney, Governor of Delaware filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountCertificate of Word Count
Oct 23 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/8/2019.
Nov 12 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/15/2019.
Nov 18 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/22/2019.
Dec 02 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/6/2019.
Dec 06 2019Petition GRANTED. In addition to the questions presented by the petition, the parties are directed to brief and argue the following question: Whether respondent has demonstrated Article III standing.
Jan 17 2020Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, John C. Carney, Governor of Delaware.
Blanket ConsentProof of Service
Jan 21 2020Joint appendix filed. (Statement of costs filed)
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jan 21 2020Brief of petitioner John C. Carney, Governor of Delaware filed. (February 13, 2020 - Corrected brief to be filed.)
Jan 21 2020Brief of petitioner John C. Carney, Governor of Delaware filed (2/13/2020).
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 24 2020Brief amici curiae of Former Chief Justices of the Delaware Supreme Court filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 27 2020Brief amici curiae of Professors filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 28 2020Brief amici curiae of State and Local Government Associations filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 28 2020Brief amici curiae of Former Governors of the State of Delaware filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jan 28 2020Brief amici curiae of The Delaware State Bar Association filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 28 2020Brief amici curiae of Professors Brian D. Feinstein and Daniel J. Hemel filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 28 2020Brief amicus curiae of The Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 28 2020Brief amicus curiae of The Conference of Chief Justices in support of neither party filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 28 2020Brief amicus curiae of The Brennan Center for Justice at NYU School of Law filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 28 2020Brief amicus curiae of Campaign Legal Center filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 28 2020Brief amici curiae of Anthony Daunt and Norman Shinkle filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jan 28 2020Amicus brief of Republican National Committee not accepted for filing. (February 07, 2020 - corrected brief to be submitted).
Jan 28 2020Brief amicus curiae of Republican National Committee filed (February 12, 2020 - corrected brief).
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 31 2020SET FOR ARGUMENT on Wednesday, March 25, 2020.
Feb 19 2020Record requested from the U.S.C.A. 3rd Circuit.
Feb 19 2020CIRCULATED
Feb 20 2020Brief of respondent James R. Adams filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 24 2020The record received from the U.S.C.A. 3rd Circuit as well as the U.S.D.C. District of Delaware (Wilmington). Both records are complete and has been electronically filed.
Feb 26 2020Brief amicus curiae of Cato Institute filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 26 2020Brief amicus curiae of Public Citizen filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 27 2020Brief amici curiae of Lawyers and Professors filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 27 2020Brief amicus curiae of Libertarian National Committee filed. (Distributed). (Corrected brief to be submitted - March 16, 2020).
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 13 2020Reply of John C. Carney, Governor of Delaware not accepted for filing. (March 16, 2020 - Corrected brief submitted)
Mar 13 2020Reply of petitioner John C. Carney, Governor of Delaware filed (3/16/2020). (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 16 2020ORAL ARGUMENT POSTPONED.
Apr 13 2020Argument to be rescheduled for the October Term 2020.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Michael W. McConnell
    Counsel of Record
Wilson Sonsini Goodrich & Rosati, PC
1700 K Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20006

mmcconnell@wsgr.com
202-973-8800
Party name: John C. Carney, Governor of Delaware
Attorneys for Respondent
David Lee Finger
    Counsel of Record
Finger & Slanina, LLC
1201 N. Orange St., 7th fl.
Wilmington, DE 19801

dfinger@delawgroup.com
(302) 573-2525
Party name: James R. Adams
Other
Robert L. Byer
    Counsel of Record
Duane Morris LLP
600 Grant Street
Suite 5010
Pittsburgh, PA 15219

rlbyer@duanemorris.com
4124971083
Party name: The Conference of Chief Justices
Eric F. Citron
    Counsel of Record
Goldstein & Russell, P.C.
7475 Wisconsin Ave., Suite 850
Bethesda, MD 20814

ecitron@goldsteinrussell.com
(202) 362-0636
Party name: Professors Brian D. Feinstein and Daniel J. Hemel
Richard Wayland Clary
    Counsel of Record
Cravath, Swaine & Moore, LLP
825 Eighth Avenue
New York, NY 10019

rclary@cravath.com
2124741000
Party name: The Brennan Center for Justice at NYU School of Law
Kirti Datla
    Counsel of Record
Hogan Lovells US LLP
555 13th Street, NW
Washington, DC 20004

Kirti.datla@hoganlovells.com
2026376583
Party name: State and Local Government Associations
Richard Alan Forsten
    Counsel of Record
Saul Ewing Arnstein & Lehr
1201 N. Market Street Suite 2300
P.O. Box 1266
Wilmington, DE 19801

richard.forsten@saul.com
302-421-6833
Party name: The Delaware State Bar Association
Joel Edan Friedlander
    Counsel of Record
Friedlander & Gorris, P.A.
1201 N. Market Street
Suite 2200
Wilmington, DE 19801

jfriedlander@friedlandergorris.com
3025733500
Party name: Joel Edan Friedlander
Gregory George Garre
    Counsel of Record
Latham & Watkins LLP
555 11th Street, NW
Suite 1000
Washington, DC 20004

gregory.garre@lw.com
202-637-2207
Party name: The Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America
Oliver Barrett Hall
    Counsel of Record
2515 Cliffbourne Pl NW
Washington, DC 20009

oliverhall@competitivedemocracy.org
202-280-0898
Party name: Libertarian National Committee
Caitlin Joan Halligan
    Counsel of Record
Selendy & Gay PLLC
1290 Avenue of the Americas
New York, NY 10104

challigan@selendygay.com
(212) 390-9000
Party name: Campaign Legal Center
Kaitlin Eileen Leary
    Counsel of Record
Public Citizen Litigation Group
1600 20th Street NW
Washington, DC 20009

kleary@citizen.org
2025887713
Party name: Public Citizen
Theodore N. Mirvis
    Counsel of Record
Wachtell, Lipton, Rosen & Katz
51 West 52nd Street
New York, NY 10019

tnmirvis@wlrk.com
(212) 403-1204
Party name: Former Governors of the State of Delaware
Richard Bryan Raile
    Counsel of Record
Baker & Hostetler, LLP
1050 Connecticut Ave NW, Suite 1100
Washington, DC 20036

rraile@bakerlaw.com
202-861-1711
Party name: Republican National Committee
Virginia Anne Seitz
    Counsel of Record
Sidley Austin LLP
1501 K Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20005

vseitz@sidley.com
202-736-8000
Party name: Former Chief Justices of the Delaware Supreme Court
Rodney A. Smolla
    Counsel of Record
Attorney At Law
4601 Concord Pike
Wilmington,, DE 19803

rasmolla@widener.edu
3024772278
Party name: PROFESSORS
Jason Brett Torchinsky
    Counsel of Record
Holtzman Vogel Josefiak Torchinsky PLLC
45 North Hill Dr., Suite 100
Warrenton, VA 20186

Jtorchinsky@hvjt.law
540 341 8808
Party name: Anthony Daunt and Norman Shinkle
Eugene Volokh
    Counsel of Record
UCLA School of Law
385 Charles E. Young Dr. E
Los Angeles, CA 90095

volokh@law.ucla.edu
310-206-3926
Party name: Cato Institute