No. 19-307
Title:Stuart A. McKeever, Petitioner
v.
William P. Barr, Attorney General
Docketed:September 5, 2019
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the District of Columbia Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-5149)
   Decision Date:April 5, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:July 22, 2019
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Sep 05 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 7, 2019)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 02 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from October 7, 2019 to November 6, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Oct 03 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including November 6, 2019.
Oct 07 2019Brief amicus curiae of Constitutional Accountability Center filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 28 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from November 6, 2019 to November 22, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Oct 29 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including November 22, 2019.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Roman Martinez V
    Counsel of Record
Latham & Watkins, LLP
555 Eleventh Street, NW
Suite 1000
Washington, DC 20004

roman.martinez@lw.com
202-637-3377
Party name: Stuart A. McKeever
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Barr, Att'y Gen.
Other
Brianne Jenna Gorod
    Counsel of Record
Constitutional Accountability Center
1200 18th Street, NW
Suite 501
Washington, DC 20036

brianne@theusconstitution.org
202 296 6889
Party name: Constitutional Accountability Center