No. 19-304
Title:Ranger American of the V.I., Inc., et al., Petitioners
v.
Frederick J. Balboni, Jr.
Docketed:September 5, 2019
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of the Virgin Islands
   Case Numbers:(2018-0022)
   Decision Date:June 3, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Sep 03 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 7, 2019)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 27 2019Waiver of right of respondent Frederick J. Balboni, Jr. to respond filed.
Main Document
Oct 02 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/18/2019.
Oct 08 2019Response Requested. (Due November 7, 2019)
Nov 04 2019Brief of respondent Frederick J. Balboni, Jr. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Andrew C. Simpson
    Counsel of Record
Andrew C Simpson, PC
2191 Church street
Ste 5
Christiansted, VI 00820

asimpson@coralbrief.com
3407193900
Party name: Ranger American of the V.I., Inc., et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Dana Marie Hrelic
    Counsel of Record
Horton, Dowd, Bartschi & Levesque, P.C.
90 Gillett Street
Hartford, CT 06105

dhrelic@hdblfirm.com
(860) 522-8338
Party name: Frederick J. Balboni, Jr.