No. 19-296
Title:Damien Guedes, et al., Petitioners
v.
Bureau of Alcohol, Tobacco, Firearms and Explosives, et al.
Docketed:September 4, 2019
Linked with 18A1352
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the District of Columbia Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-5042)
   Decision Date:April 1, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 18 2019Application (18A1352) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from June 30, 2019 to August 29, 2019, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jun 24 2019Application (18A1352) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until August 29, 2019.
Aug 29 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 4, 2019)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of ServiceOther
Sep 13 2019Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Damien Guedes, et al.
Blanket Consent
Sep 24 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from October 4, 2019 to November 4, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Sep 25 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including November 4, 2019.
Oct 02 2019Brief amicus curiae of Firearms Policy Coalition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Oct 02 2019Brief amici curiae of NFA Freedom Alliance, Inc., California Gun Rights Foundation, and Arizona Citizens Defense League filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 03 2019Brief amicus curiae of Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 03 2019Brief amicus curiae of The Cato Institute filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 03 2019Brief amici curiae of Due Process Institute filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 03 2019Brief amicus curiae of National Right to Work Legal Defense Foundation, Inc. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 04 2019Brief amicus curiae of New Civil Liberties Alliance filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 31 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from November 4, 2019 to December 4, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Nov 04 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including December 4, 2019.
Dec 04 2019Brief of respondents Bureau of Alcohol, Tobacco, Firearms and Explosives, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word Count
Dec 18 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/10/2020.
Dec 19 2019Reply of petitioners Damien Guedes, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 13 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/17/2020.
Jan 21 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/24/2020.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Erik S. Jaffe
    Counsel of Record
Schaerr | Jaffe LLP
1717 K Street, N.W., Suite 900
Washington, DC 20006

ejaffe@schaerr-jaffe.com
202-415-7412
Party name: Damien Guedes, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Bureau of Alcohol, Tobacco, Firearms and Explosives, et al.
Other
John D. Cline
    Counsel of Record
Law Office of John D. Cline
One Embarcadero Center
Suite 500
San Francisco, CA 94111

cline@johndclinelaw.com
415-662-2260
Party name: Due Process Institute
Aditya Dynar
    Counsel of Record
New Civil Liberties Alliance
Litigation Counsel
1225 19th Street NW Suite 450
Washington, DC 20036

adi.dynar@ncla.onmicrosoft.com
(202) 908-6202
Party name: New Civil Liberties Alliance
John C. Eastman
    Counsel of Record
Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence
c/o Fowler School of Law Chapman University
One University Drive
Orange, CA 92866

jeastman@chapman.edu
877-855-3330
Party name: Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence
Joseph Gary Samuel Greenlee
    Counsel of Record
Firearms Policy Coalition
1215 K Street, 17th Floor
Sacramento, CA 95814

josephgreenlee@gmail.com
(970) 485-3303
Party name: Firearms Policy Coalition
Raymond J. LaJeunesse Jr.
    Counsel of Record
National Right to Work Legal Foundation, Inc.
8001 Braddock Rd, Suite 600
Springfield, VA 22151

rjl@nrtw.org
703-321-8510
Party name: National Right to Work Legal Defense Foundation, Inc.
Daniel L. Schmutter
    Counsel of Record
Hartman & Winnicki, P.C.
74 Passaic Street
Ridgewood, NJ 07450

dschmutter@hartmanwinnicki.com
201-967-8040
Party name: NFA Freedom Alliance, Inc., California Gun Rights Foundation, and Arizona Citizens Defense League
Ilya Shapiro
    Counsel of Record
Cato Institute
1000 Massachusetts Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20001

ishapiro@cato.org
2028420200
Party name: The Cato Institute