No. 19-293
Title:TKC Aerospace Inc., Petitioner
v.
Charles Taylor Muhs
Docketed:September 4, 2019
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-1372)
   Decision Date:May 8, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:June 4, 2019
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Sep 03 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 4, 2019)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 09 2019Waiver of right of respondent Charles Muhs to respond filed.
Main Document
Sep 18 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/11/2019.
Sep 27 2019Response Requested. (Due October 28, 2019)
Oct 28 2019Brief of Charles Muhs in opposition not accepted for filing. (November 01, 2019 - Corrected brief to be submitted)
Oct 28 2019Brief of respondent Charles Muhs in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Nicholas Martin Depalma
    Counsel of Record
Venable, LLP
8010 Towers Crescent Drive, Suite 300
Tysons Corner, VA 22182

nmdepalma@venable.com
7039051455
Party name: TKC Aerospace, Inc.
Attorneys for Respondent
Daniel M. Press
    Counsel of Record
Chung & Press, P.C.
6718 Whittier Avenue
Suite 200
McLean, VA 22101

dpress@chung-press.com
7037343800
Party name: Charles Muhs