No. 19-292
Title:Roxanne Torres, Petitioner
v.
Janice Madrid, et al.
Docketed:September 4, 2019
Linked with 19A45
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-2134)
   Decision Date:May 2, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jul 08 2019Application (19A45) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from July 31, 2019 to August 30, 2019, submitted to Justice Sotomayor.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jul 15 2019Application (19A45) granted by Justice Sotomayor extending the time to file until August 30, 2019.
Aug 30 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 4, 2019)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 02 2019Brief amici curiae of The American Civil Liberties Union and the ACLU of New Mexico, filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 03 2019Brief amicus curiae of Cato Institute filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 03 2019Waiver of right of respondent Janice Madrid, et al. to respond filed.
Main Document
Oct 04 2019Brief amici curiae of Fourth Amendment Scholars filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 04 2019Brief amicus curiae of The Rutherford Institute filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Oct 09 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/1/2019.
Oct 10 2019Response Requested. (Due November 12, 2019)
Nov 12 2019Brief of respondents Janice Madrid, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 25 2019Reply of petitioner Roxanne Torres filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 26 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/13/2019.
Dec 18 2019Petition GRANTED.
Jan 23 2020Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Roxanne Torres.
Blanket Consent
Jan 23 2020Blanket Consent filed by Respondents, Janice Madrid, et al.
Blanket Consent
Jan 31 2020SET FOR ARGUMENT on Monday, March 30, 2020.
Jan 31 2020Joint appendix filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jan 31 2020Brief of petitioner Roxanne Torres filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 06 2020Brief amicus curiae of Constitutional Accountability Center filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 07 2020Brief amici curiae of The Rutherford Institute and National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 07 2020Brief amicus curiae of NAACP Legal Defense and Educational Fund, Inc. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 07 2020Brief amici curiae of Fourth Amendment Scholars filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 07 2020Brief amicus curiae of the United States filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Feb 07 2020Brief amici curiae of The American Association for Justice, the Cato Institute, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 07 2020Brief amicus curiae of Restore the Fourth, Inc. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 07 2020Brief amici curiae of American Civil Liberties Union and the ACLU of New Mexico, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 19 2020CIRCULATED
Feb 19 2020Record requested from the U.S.C.A. 10th Circuit.
Feb 19 2020Motion of the Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument filed.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Feb 19 2020The record of the USCA 10th Circuit is available on PACER.
Mar 02 2020Brief of respondents Janice Madrid, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 09 2020Motion of the Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument GRANTED.
Mar 09 2020Brief amici curiae of National Association of Counties, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 16 2020ORAL ARGUMENT POSTPONED.
Mar 25 2020Reply of petitioner Roxanne Torres filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 13 2020Argument to be rescheduled for the October Term 2020.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Kelsi Brown Corkran
    Counsel of Record
Orrick, Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP
1152 15th Street NW
Washington, DC 20005

kcorkran@orrick.com
202-339-8497
Party name: Roxanne Torres
Attorneys for Respondents
Mark Daniel Standridge
    Counsel of Record
Jarmie & Rogers, P.C.
P.O. Box 344
500 North Church Street
Las Cruces, NM 88004

mstandridge@jarmielaw.com
(575) 526-3338
Party name: Janice Madrid, et al.
Other
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Ginger D. Anders
    Counsel of Record
Munger, Tolles & Olson LLP
1155 F Street NW
7th Floor
Washington, DC 20004

ginger.anders@mto.com
2022201107
Party name: Fourth Amendment Scholars
David D. Cole
    Counsel of Record
American Civil Liberties Union Foundation
915 15th Street, NW
Washington, DC 20005

dcole@aclu.org
212-549-2500
Party name: American Civil Liberties Union and the ACLU of New Mexico
Brianne Jenna Gorod
    Counsel of Record
Constitutional Accountability Center
1200 18th Street, NW
Suite 501
Washington, DC 20036

brianne@theusconstitution.org
202 296 6889
Party name: Constitutional Accountability Center
Jeffrey T. Green
    Counsel of Record
Sidley Austin
1501 K Street, NW
Washington, DC 20005

jgreen@sidley.com
202 736 8291
Party name: The Rutherford Institute and the National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers
Jin Hee Lee
    Counsel of Record
NAACP Legal Defense and Educational Fund, Inc.
40 Rector Street
5th Floor
New York, NY 10006

jlee@naacpldf.org
(212) 965-3702
Party name: NAACP Legal Defense and Educational Fund, Inc.
Anton Metlitsky
    Counsel of Record
O'Melveny & Myers, LLP
Times Square Tower, 7 Times Square
New York, NY 10036

ametlitsky@omm.com
2123262000
Party name: The American Association for the Justice, Cato Institute, et al.
Elizabeth Barchas Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Cooley LLP
1299 Pennsylvania Ave
Washington, DC 20004

eprelogar@cooley.com
(202) 776-2076
Party name: National Association of Counties, National League of Cities, U.S. Conference of Mayors, International City/County Management Association, International Municipal Lawyers association, and National Sheriffs' Association
Mahesha Padmanabhan Subbaraman
    Counsel of Record
Subbaraman PLLC
222 S. 9th St., Suite 1600
Minneapolis, MN 55402

mps@subblaw.com
612-315-9210
Party name: Restore the Fourth, Inc.