No. 19-288 | |
Title: | Javier Sanchez, Gregory Casorso, and Michael Marr, Petitioners v. United States |
Docketed: | September 4, 2019 |
Linked with 18A1342 | |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit |
Case Numbers: | (17-10519, 17-10528, 18-10113) |
Decision Date: | January 25, 2019 |
Rehearing Denied: | April 3, 2019 |
Date | Proceedings and Orders |
Jun 17 2019 | Application (18A1342) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from July 2, 2019 to August 1, 2019, submitted to Justice Kagan. |
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service | |
Jun 19 2019 | Application (18A1342) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until August 1, 2019. |
Jul 15 2019 | Application (18A1342) to extend further the time from August 1, 2019 to August 30, 2019, submitted to Justice Kagan. |
Written RequestProof of ServiceWritten RequestWritten RequestWritten Request | |
Jul 17 2019 | Application (18A1342) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until August 30, 2019. |
Aug 30 2019 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 4, 2019) |
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Sep 12 2019 | Waiver of right of respondent United States of America to respond filed. |
Main Document | |
Sep 17 2019 | Blanket Consent filed by Petitioners, Javier Sanchez, et al. |
Blanket ConsentProof of Service | |
Sep 18 2019 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/11/2019. |
Sep 24 2019 | Response Requested. (Due October 24, 2019) |
Oct 16 2019 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from October 24, 2019 to November 25, 2019, submitted to The Clerk. |
Main Document | |
Oct 17 2019 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including November 25, 2019. |
Oct 24 2019 | Brief amicus curiae of Due Process Institute filed. |
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Oct 24 2019 | Brief amicus curiae of National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers filed. |
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Nov 25 2019 | Brief of respondent United States of America in opposition filed. |
Main DocumentCertificate of Word Count | |
Dec 05 2019 | Reply of petitioners Javier Sanchez, et al. filed. |
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Dec 11 2019 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/10/2020. |
Jan 13 2020 | Petition DENIED. |
NAME | ADDRESS | PHONE |
Attorneys for Petitioners | ||
Jeffrey L. Fisher Counsel of Record | O'Melveny & Myers LLP 2765 Sand Hill Road Menlo Park, CA 94025 jlfisher@omm.com | 6504732600 |
Party name: Javier Sanchez, et al. | ||
Attorneys for Respondent | ||
Noel J. Francisco Counsel of Record | Solicitor General United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW Washington, DC 20530-0001 SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov | 202-514-2217 |
Party name: United States of America | ||
Other | ||
Daniel Erin Jackson Counsel of Record | Keker, Van Nest & Peters LLP 633 Battery Street San Francisco, CA 94111 djackson@keker.com | 4153915400 |
Party name: National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers | ||
Erin E. Murphy Counsel of Record | Kirkland & Ellis LLP 1301 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW Washington, DC 20004 erin.murphy@kirkland.com | 2023895000 |
Party name: Due Process Institute |