No. 19-284
Title:Jose Jesus Mercado Ramirez, Petitioner
v.
William P. Barr, Attorney General
Docketed:September 3, 2019
Linked with 18A1354
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(14-72415)
   Decision Date:December 19, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:April 1, 2019
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 19 2019Application (18A1354) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from June 30, 2019 to August 29, 2019, submitted to Justice Kagan.
Jun 19 2019Pursuant to Rule 34.6 and Paragraph 9 of the Guidelines for the Submission of Documents to the Supreme Court's Electronic Filing System, filings in this case should be submitted in paper form only, and should not be submitted through the Court's electronic filing system.
Jun 21 2019Application (18A1354) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until August 29, 2019.
Aug 29 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 3, 2019)
Sep 25 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from October 3, 2019 to November 4, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Sep 25 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including November 4, 2019.
Oct 25 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from November 4, 2019 to December 4, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Oct 25 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including December 4, 2019.
Nov 29 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from December 4, 2019 to January 3, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Nov 29 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including January 3, 2020.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Jerome Philippe Mayer-Cantu4287 Gilbert Street
Oakland, CA 94611

jmayercantu@gmail.com
(415) 530-6444
Party name: Jose J. Mercado-Ramirez
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Barr, Att'y Gen.