No. 19-281
Title:Capital Associated Industries, Inc., Petitioner
v.
Josh Stein, Attorney General of North Carolina, et al.
Docketed:September 3, 2019
Linked with 18A1321
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-2218)
   Decision Date:April 19, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 10 2019Application (18A1321) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from July 18, 2019 to August 30, 2019, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Main Document
Jun 19 2019Application (18A1321) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until August 30, 2019.
Aug 30 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 3, 2019)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 25 2019Waiver of right of respondent North Carolina State Bar to respond filed.
Main Document
Sep 25 2019Waiver of right of respondents Josh Stein, Nancy Lorrin Freeman, and Avery Crump to respond filed.
Main Document
Oct 01 2019Brief amici curiae of N.C. Chamber Legal Institute, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 02 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/18/2019.
Oct 02 2019Brief amici curiae of Responsive Law and Scholars of Access to Justice filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 03 2019Brief amicus curiae of The Employer Associations of America filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 10 2019Response Requested. (Due November 12, 2019)

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Reid Lloyd Phillips
    Counsel of Record
Brooks, Pierce, McLendon, Humphrey & Leonard LLP
2000 Renaissance Plaza
230 North Elm Street
Greensboro, NC 27401

rphillips@brookspierce.com
336-373-8850
Party name: Capital Associated Industries, Inc.
Attorneys for Respondents
Alan William Duncan
    Counsel of Record
Mullins Duncan Harrell & Russell PLLC
300 N. Greene St., Ste 2000
Greensboro, NC 27401

aduncan@mullinsduncan.com
336-645-3320
Party name: North Carolina State Bar
Matthew W. Sawchak
    Counsel of Record
North Carolina Dept. of Justice
P.O. Box 629
Raleigh, NC 27602

msawchak@ncdoj.gov
(919) 716-6400
Party name: Josh Stein, Nancy Lorrin Freeman, and Avery Crump
Other
Christopher G. Browning Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Troutman Sanders LLP
305 Church at North Hills Street
Suite 1200
Raleigh, NC 27609

chris.browning@troutmansanders.com
(919) 835-4127
Party name: N.C. Chamber Legal Institute, et al.
Gregory A Beck
    Counsel of Record
1250 Connecticut Avenue NW
Suite 700
Washington, DC 20036

greg@guptawessler.com
2026846339
Party name: Responsive Law and Scholars of Access to Justice
Tejinder Singh
    Counsel of Record
Goldstein & Russel, P.C.
7475 Wisconsin Avenue
Suite 850
Bethesda, MD 20814

tsingh@goldsteinrussell.com
(202) 362-0636
Party name: The Employer Associations of America