No. 19-28
Title:Kenneth Daniels, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:July 2, 2019
Linked with 18A996
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Third Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-3503)
   Decision Date:February 7, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Mar 29 2019Application (18A996) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from May 8, 2019 to July 7, 2019, submitted to Justice Alito.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Apr 01 2019Application (18A996) granted by Justice Alito extending the time to file until July 7, 2019.
Jul 01 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due August 1, 2019)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 30 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from August 1, 2019 to September 3, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jul 31 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including September 3, 2019.
Sep 03 2019Brief of respondent United States filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Sep 18 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/11/2019.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Michael B. Kimberly
    Counsel of Record
MCDERMOTT WILL & EMERY
500 North Capitol Street, NW
The McDermott Building
Washington, DC 20001

mkimberly@mwe.com
(202) 756-8901
Party name: Kenneth Daniels
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States