No. 19-268
Title:Park Properties Associates, L.P., et al., Petitioners
v.
United States
Docketed:August 29, 2019
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
   Case Numbers:(2017-2279, 2017-2344)
   Decision Date:February 19, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:May 30, 2019
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Aug 28 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due September 30, 2019)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 24 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from September 30, 2019 to October 30, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Sep 25 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including October 30, 2019.
Oct 22 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from October 30, 2019 to November 13, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Oct 23 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including November 13, 2019.
Nov 13 2019Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word Count
Nov 25 2019Reply of petitioners Park Properties Associates, L.P., et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 26 2019Letter of November 26, 2019 waiving 14-day waiting period pursuant to Rule 15.5 filed. (Received December 2, 2019)
Main Document
Dec 04 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/10/2020.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Matthew Langley Knowles
    Counsel of Record
McDermott Will & Emery LLP
28 State Street
Boston, MA 02109

mknowles@mwe.com
6175353885
Party name: Park Properties Associates, L.P., et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States