No. 19-267
Title:Our Lady of Guadalupe School, Petitioner
v.
Agnes Morrissey-Berru
Docketed:August 29, 2019
Linked with 19A80
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-56624)
   Decision Date:April 30, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jul 18 2019Application (19A80) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from July 29, 2019 to August 28, 2019, submitted to Justice Kagan.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jul 19 2019Application (19A80) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until August 28, 2019.
Aug 28 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due September 30, 2019)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 11 2019Brief amicus curiae of The National Catholic Educational Association filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 26 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from September 30, 2019 to October 18, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Sep 27 2019Brief amici curiae of Professors Douglas Laycock, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 27 2019Brief amici curiae of Church of God in Christ, Inc. and Union of Orthodox Jewish Congregations of America filed. VIDED
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 27 2019Brief amici curiae of State of Alaska, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 30 2019Brief amici curiae of The Ethics & Religious Liberty Commission of the Southern Baptist Convention, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 30 2019Brief amici curiae of Christian Legal Society et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 30 2019Brief amici curiae of General Conference of Seventh-day Adventists, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 30 2019Brief amicus curiae of Stephen Wise Temple filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 30 2019Brief amicus curiae of National Legal Foundation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 01 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including October 18, 2019.
Oct 17 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from October 18, 2019 to October 28, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Oct 18 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including October 28, 2019.
Oct 28 2019Brief of respondent Agnes Morrissey-Berru in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 28 2019Waiver of the 14-day waiting period under 15.5 filed.
Main Document
Oct 30 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/15/2019.
Nov 01 2019Reply of petitioner Our Lady of Guadalupe School filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 12 2019Rescheduled.
Nov 26 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/13/2019.
Dec 18 2019Petition GRANTED. The petition for a writ of certiorari in No. 19-348 is granted. The cases are consolidated, and a total of one hour is allotted for oral argument. VIDED.
Dec 18 2019Because the Court has consolidated these cases for briefing and oral argument, future filings and activity in the cases will now be reflected on the docket of No. 19-267. Subsequent filings in these cases must therefore be submitted through the electronic filing system in No. 19-267. Each document submitted in connection with one or more of these cases must include on its cover the case number and caption for each case in which the filing is intended to be submitted. Where a filing is submitted in fewer than all of the cases, the docket entry will reflect the case number(s) in which the filing is submitted; a document filed in all of the consolidated cases will be noted as “VIDED.”
Jan 27 2020Consent to the filing of amicus briefs received from counsel for Our Lady of Guadalupe School submitted.
Blanket Consent

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Eric Christopher Rassbach
    Counsel of Record
The Becket Fund for Religious Liberty
1200 New Hampshire Avenue, NW
Suite 700
Washington, DC 20036

erassbach@becketlaw.org
2029550095
Party name: Our Lady of Guadalupe School
Attorneys for Respondent
Jennifer Anne Lipski
    Counsel of Record
JML Law, A Professional Law Corporation
5855 Topanga Canyon Boulevard, Suite 300
Woodland Hills, CA 91367

jennifer@jmllaw.com
818-610-8800
Party name: Agnes Morrissey-Berru
Jennifer A. LipskiJML Law
5855 Topanga Canyon Blvd., Suite 300
Woodland Hills, CA 91367

jennifer@jmllaw.com
818-610-8800
Party name: Agnes Morrissey-Berru
Other
Frederick W. Claybrook Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Claybrook, LLC
700 Sixth St., NW, Ste.430
Washington, DC 20001

rick@claybrooklaw.com
202-250-3883
Party name: National Legal Foundation
Paul D. Clement
    Counsel of Record
Kirkland & Ellis LLP
1301 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20004

paul.clement@kirkland.com
2023895000
Party name: Stephen Wise Temple
Katherine Elizabeth Demarest
    Counsel of Record
State of Alaska Office of the Attorney General
1031 W. 4th Avenue
Anchorage, AK 99501

kate.demarest@alaska.gov
(907) 269-5100
Party name: State of Alaska
Victoria Dorfman
    Counsel of Record
Jones Day
51 Louisiana Ave. NW
Washington, DC 20001

vdorfman@jonesday.com
(202) 879-3939
Party name: Professors Douglas Laycock, et al.
Thomas William Parker Douglas
    Counsel of Record
Douglas Law PLLC
106 East 8th Street
Holland, MI 49423

parkerdouglas66@gmail.com
801-699-7746
Party name: The National Catholic Educational Association
Thomas Henderson Dupree Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher, LLP
1050 Connecticut Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20036

tdupree@gibsondunn.com
202-955-8500
Party name: Church of God in Christ, Inc. and Union of Orthodox Jewish Congregations of America
Sarah Michelle Harris
    Counsel of Record
Williams & Connolly LLP
725 Twelfth Street NW
Washington, DC 20005

sharris@wc.com
202-434-5000
Party name: The Ethics & Religious Liberty Commission of the Southern Baptist Convention, et al.
Eric D. McArthur
    Counsel of Record
Sidley Austin LLP
1501 K Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20005

emcarthur@sidley.com
202-736-8000
Party name: General Conference of Seventh-day Adventists and Jewish Coalition for Religious Liberty
Reed Neal Smith
    Counsel of Record
Christian Legal Society
8001 Braddock Rd.
Suite 302
Springfield, VA 22314

rsmith@clsnet.org
7038941081
Party name: Christian Legal Society et al.