No. 19-255
Vide 19-251
Title:Thomas More Law Center, Petitioner
v.
Xavier Becerra, Attorney General of California
Docketed:August 26, 2019
Linked with 18A1268
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(16-56855, 16-56902)
   Decision Date:September 11, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:March 29, 2019
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 03 2019Application (18A1268) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from June 27, 2019 to August 26, 2019, submitted to Justice Kagan.
Main Document
Jun 05 2019Application (18A1268) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until August 26, 2019.
Aug 26 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due September 25, 2019)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 28 2019Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Thomas More Law Center.
Blanket Consent
Sep 09 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from September 25, 2019 to October 25, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Sep 11 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including October 25, 2019.
Sep 24 2019Brief amicus curiae of Institute for Justice filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 25 2019Brief amicus curiae of Proposition 8 Legal Defense Fund filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 25 2019Brief amicus curiae of Goldwater Institute filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 25 2019Brief amicus curiae of New Civil Liberties Alliance filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 25 2019Brief amicus curiae of Hispanic Leadership Fund filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 25 2019Brief amici curiae of Cato Institute, et al. filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 25 2019Brief amici curiae of Philanthropy Roundtable, et al. filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 25 2019Brief amici curiae of 24 Family Policy Organizations filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 25 2019Brief amici curiae of The Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, et al. filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 25 2019Brief amici curiae of Free Speech Coalition, et al. filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 25 2019Brief amicus curiae of American Center for Law and Justice filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 25 2019Brief amici curiae of Public Interest Legal Foundation, Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence, Foundation for Michigan Freedom and Texas Public Policy Foundation filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 25 2019Brief amicus curiae of Institute for Free Speech filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 03 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from October 25, 2019 to November 25, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Oct 07 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including November 25, 2019.
Nov 25 2019Brief of respondent Xavier Becerra in opposition filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 10 2019Reply of petitioner Thomas More Law Center filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 11 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/10/2020.
Jan 13 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/17/2020.
Jan 21 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/24/2020.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
John J. Bursch
    Counsel of Record
Alliance Defending Freedom
440 First Street, NW
Suite 600
Washington, DC 20001

jbursch@adflegal.org
(616) 450-4235
Party name: Thomas More Law Center
Attorneys for Respondent
Aimee Athena Feinberg
    Counsel of Record
California Department of Justice
1300 I Street
Sacramento, CA 95814

Aimee.Feinberg@doj.ca.gov
916-210-6003
Party name: Xavier Becerra
Other
Caleb P. Burns
    Counsel of Record
Wiley Rein LLP
1776 K Street, NW
Washington, DC 20006

cburns@wileyrein.com
202-719-7000
Party name: The Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America and The U.S. Chamber of Commerce Foundation
Allen Joseph Dickerson
    Counsel of Record
Institute for Free Speech
124 S. West Street
Suite 201
Alexandria, VA 22314

adickerson@ifs.org
7038946846
Party name: Institute for Free Speech
Jeffrey Matthew Harris
    Counsel of Record
Consovoy McCarthy PLLC
1600 Wilson Blvd.
Suite 700
Arlington, VA 22209

jeff@consovoymccarthy.com
202-243-9423
Party name: Hispanic Leadership Fund
Margaret Ann Little
    Counsel of Record
New Civil Liberties Alliance
1225 19th St. NW
Suite450
Washington, DC 20036

peggy.little@ncla.onmicrosoft.com
2028695210
Party name: New Civil Liberties Alliance
Anita Yvonne Milanovich
    Counsel of Record
Milanovich Law, PLLC
100 E Broadway Street, The Berkeley Room
Butte, MT 59701

aymilanovich@milanovichlaw.com
4065896856
Party name: 24 Family Policy Organizations
Matthew Robert Miller
    Counsel of Record
Goldwater Institute
500 E. Coronado Rd.
Phoenix, AZ 85004

mmiller@goldwaterinstitute.org
6024625000
Party name: Goldwater Institute
Kaylan Lytle Phillips
    Counsel of Record
Public Interest Legal Foundation
32 E. Washington, Suite 1675
Indianapolis,, IN 46204

kphillips@publicinterestlegal.org
3172035599
Party name: Public Interest Legal Foundation, Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence, Foundation for Michigan Freedom and Texas Public Policy Foundation
Andrew P. Pugno
    Counsel of Record
Law Offices of Andrew P. Pugno
8261 Greenback Lane
Suite 200
Fair Oaks, CA 95628-2533

andrew@pugnolaw.com
9166083065
Party name: Proposition 8 Legal Defense Fund
Alexander Lyman Reid
    Counsel of Record
Morgan Lewis & Bockius LLP
1111 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20004

alexander.reid@morganlewis.com
(202) 739-3000
Party name: Philanthropy Roundtable, Independent Women's Forum, and People United for Privacy Foundation
Jay Alan Sekulow
    Counsel of Record
American Center for Law and Justice
201 Maryland Avenue, N.E.
Washington, D.C., DC 20002

sekulow@aclj.org
202-546-8890
Party name: American Center for Law and Justice
Ilya Shapiro
    Counsel of Record
Cato Institute
1000 Massachusetts Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20001

ishapiro@cato.org
2028420200
Party name: Cato Institute
Paul Michael Sherman
    Counsel of Record
Institute for Justice
901 North Glebe Road
Suite 900
Arlington, VA 22203

psherman@ij.org
7036829320
Party name: Institute for Justice
Herbert William Titus
    Counsel of Record
William J. Olson, P.C.
370 Maple Avenue West
Suite 4
Vienna, VA 22180

htitus@cox.net
7033565070
Party name: Free Speech Coalition, et al.