No. 19-251
Vide 19-255
Title:Americans for Prosperity Foundation, Petitioner
v.
Xavier Becerra, Attorney General of California
Docketed:August 26, 2019
Linked with 18A1224
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(16-55727, 16-55786)
   Decision Date:September 11, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:March 29, 2019
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
May 28 2019Application (18A1224) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from June 27, 2019 to August 26, 2019, submitted to Justice Kagan.
Main DocumentProof of Service
May 28 2019Application (18A1224) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until August 26, 2019.
Aug 26 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due September 25, 2019)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 06 2019Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Americans for Prosperity Foundation.
Blanket Consent
Sep 09 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from September 25, 2019 to October 25, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Sep 11 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including October 25, 2019.
Sep 24 2019Brief amicus curiae of Pacific Legal Foundation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 24 2019Brief amicus curiae of Liberty Justice Center filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 24 2019Brief amicus curiae of Institute for Justice filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 25 2019Brief amici curiae of Pacific Research Institute, Project for Privacy and Surveillance Accountability filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 25 2019Brief amicus curiae of Proposition 8 Legal Defense Fund filed. VIDED
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 25 2019Brief amicus curiae of The Buckeye Institute filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 25 2019Brief amicus curiae of American Center for Law and Justice filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 25 2019Brief amici curiae of Public Interest Legal Foundation, Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence, Foundation for Michigan Freedom and Texas Public Policy Foundation filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 25 2019Brief amicus curiae of The National Association of Manufacturers filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 25 2019Brief amicus curiae of New Civil Liberties Alliance filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 25 2019Brief amicus curiae of Hispanic Leadership Fund filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 25 2019Brief amici curiae of Cato Institute, et al. filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 25 2019Brief amici curiae of Philanthropy Roundtable, et al. filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 25 2019Brief amici curiae of 24 Family Policy Organizations filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 25 2019Brief amici curiae of The Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, et al. filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 25 2019Brief amicus curiae of Council on American-Islamic Relations filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 25 2019Brief amicus curiae of Public Integrity Alliance filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 25 2019Brief amicus curiae of Judicial Watch, Inc. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 25 2019Brief amici curiae of States of Arizona et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 25 2019Brief amicus curiae of American Target Advertising, Inc. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 25 2019Brief amicus curiae of Institute for Free Speech filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 25 2019Brief amici curiae of Free Speech Coalition, et al. filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 03 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from October 25, 2019 to November 25, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Oct 07 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including November 25, 2019.
Nov 25 2019Brief of respondent Xavier Becerra, in his official capacity as the Attorney General of California in opposition filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Derek L. Shaffer
    Counsel of Record
Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP
1300 I Street NW, Suite 900
Washington, DC 20005

derekshaffer@quinnemanuel.com
(202) 538-8000
Party name: Americans for Prosperity Foundation
Attorneys for Respondent
Aimee Athena Feinberg
    Counsel of Record
California Department of Justice
1300 I Street
Sacramento, CA 95814

Aimee.Feinberg@doj.ca.gov
916-210-6003
Party name: Xavier Becerra, in his official capacity as the Attorney General of California
Other
Robert Daniel Alt
    Counsel of Record
The Buckeye lnstitute
88 E. Broad Street, Suite 1300
Columbus, OH 43215

robert@buckeyeinstitute.org
614-224-4422
Party name: The Buckeye Institute
Caleb P. Burns
    Counsel of Record
Wiley Rein LLP
1776 K Street, NW
Washington, DC 20006

cburns@wileyrein.com
202-719-7000
Party name: The Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America and The U.S. Chamber of Commerce Foundation
Rusty Duane Crandell
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General, State of Arizona
2005 N. Central Avenue
Phoenix, AZ 85004

Rusty.Crandell@azag.gov
6025428540
Party name: States of Arizona et al.
Allen Joseph Dickerson
    Counsel of Record
Institute for Free Speech
124 S. West Street
Suite 201
Alexandria, VA 22314

adickerson@ifs.org
7038946846
Party name: Institute for Free Speech
Mark J. Fitzgibbons
    Counsel of Record
American Target Advertising
9625 Surveyor Court
Suite 400
Manassas, VA 20110

mfitzgibbons@americantarget.com
7033927676
Party name: American Target Advertising, Inc.
Jeffrey Matthew Harris
    Counsel of Record
Consovoy McCarthy PLLC
1600 Wilson Blvd.
Suite 700
Arlington, VA 22209

jeff@consovoymccarthy.com
202-243-9423
Party name: Hispanic Leadership Fund
Erik S. Jaffe
    Counsel of Record
Schaerr | Jaffe LLP
1717 K Street, N.W., Suite 900
Washington, DC 20006

ejaffe@schaerr-jaffe.com
202-415-7412
Party name: Pacific Research Institute, Project for Privacy and Surveillance Accountability
Martin Sander Kaufman
    Counsel of Record
Atlantic Legal Foundation
500 Mamaroneck Avenue
Suite 320
Harrison, NY 10528

mskaufman@atlanticlegal.org
914.472.2356
Party name: The National Association of Manufacturers
Brian Kirk Kelsey
    Counsel of Record
Liberty Justice Center
190 S. LaSalle St., Suite 1500
Chicago, IL 60603

bkelsey@libertyjusticecenter.org
312-263-7668
Party name: Liberty Justice Center
Kory Alan Langhofer
    Counsel of Record
Statecraft PLLC
649 North Fourth Avenue, First Floor
Phoenix, AZ 85003

kory@statecraftlaw.com
6023824078
Party name: Public Integrity Alliance
Margaret Ann Little
    Counsel of Record
New Civil Liberties Alliance
1225 19th St NW
Suite 450
Washington, DC 22204

peggy.little@ncla.onmicrosoft.com
2028695212
Party name: New Civil Liberties Alliance
Lena Fatina Masri
    Counsel of Record
Council on American-Islamic Relations Legal Defense Fund
453 New Jersey Ave., S.E.
Washington, DC 20003

lmasri@cair.com
12027426420
Party name: Council on American-Islamic Relations
Anita Yvonne Milanovich
    Counsel of Record
Milanovich Law, PLLC
100 E Broadway Street, The Berkeley Room
Butte, MT 59701

aymilanovich@milanovichlaw.com
4065896856
Party name: 24 Family Policy Organizations
Kaylan Lytle Phillips
    Counsel of Record
Public Interest Legal Foundation
32 E. Washington, Suite 1675
Indianapolis,, IN 46204

kphillips@publicinterestlegal.org
3172035599
Party name: Public Interest Legal Foundation, Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence, Foundation for Michigan Freedom and Texas Public Policy Foundation
Robert D. Popper
    Counsel of Record
Judicial Watch, Inc.
425 Third Street, SW
Washington, DC 20024

rpopper@judicialwatch.org
202-646-5172
Party name: Judicial Watch, Inc.
Andrew P. Pugno
    Counsel of Record
Law Offices of Andrew P. Pugno
8261 Greenback Lane
Suite 200
Fair Oaks, CA 95628-2533

andrew@pugnolaw.com
9166083065
Party name: Proposition 8 Legal Defense Fund
Alexander Lyman Reid
    Counsel of Record
Morgan Lewis & Bockius LLP
1111 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20004

alexander.reid@morganlewis.com
(202) 739-3000
Party name: Philanthropy Roundtable, Independent Women's Forum, and People United for Privacy Foundation
Jay Alan Sekulow
    Counsel of Record
American Center for Law and Justice
201 Maryland Avenue, N.E.
Washington, DC 20002

sekulow@aclj.org
(757)226-2749
Party name: American Center for Law and Justice
Ilya Shapiro
    Counsel of Record
Cato Institute
1000 Massachusetts Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20001

ishapiro@cato.org
2028420200
Party name: Cato Institute
Paul Michael Sherman
    Counsel of Record
Institute for Justice
901 North Glebe Road
Suite 900
Arlington, VA 22203

psherman@ij.org
7036829320
Party name: Institute for Justice
Joshua Paul Thompson
    Counsel of Record
Pacific Legal Foundation
930 G Street
Sacramento, CA 95814

jthompson@pacificlegal.org
9164197111
Party name: Pacific Legal Foundation
Herbert William Titus
    Counsel of Record
William J. Olson, P.C.
370 Maple Avenue West
Suite 4
Vienna, VA 22180

htitus@cox.net
7033565070
Party name: Free Speech Coalition, et al.